Alexander Interactive, Inc. v. Adorama, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Alexander Schmelkin, Josh Levine and Alexander Interactive, Inc.
Defendant: Adorama, Inc., Adorama Enterprises LLC, Eugene Mendlowits and Mendel Mendlowits
Case Number: 1:2012cv06608
Filed: August 29, 2012
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: P. Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2014 202 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 173 Motion for Sanctions. The Court declines to modify or set aside any portion of the Memorandum and Order of June 26, 2014, and Ms. Savage's motion (Docket #.173) is DENIED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/14/2014) (lmb)
September 2, 2014 208 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 198 Motion to Seal Document: For these reasons, Samsung's motion for a sealing order (Docket no. 198) is granted. If and when the documents Bates stamped SEA000001 to SEA0000008 are submitted in connection with the plaintiff's contemplated motion to compel, they shall be filed under seal. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 9/2/2014) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
December 4, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Compel: For the foregoing reasons, the plaintiffs' motion to compel (Docket nos. 46 and 48) is granted in part a nd denied in part. The defendants are directed, as soon as practicable, to make available for review by a third party retained by the plaintiffs the Adorama source code, as well as the commit log for Adorama's.Net files. This review will take pl ace at Adorama's headquarters. In addition, the parties are directed to meet and confer, in person, within one week of the date of this order, to discuss the duration of the depositions of Mr. Braun and Mr. Roth. Magento is directed to produce t o the plaintiffs, within one week of the date of this order, performance reviews of Mr. Korotun to the extent that they relate to work performed under the Magento Agreement, and to identify the relevant version of the Zend Framework. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/4/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
January 13, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 62 Motion to Amend/Correct: For the foregoing reasons, the defendants' motion to amend its counterclaims (Docket no. 62) is granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/13/2014) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander Interactive, Inc. v. Adorama, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Schmelkin
Represented By: Denise Lynn Savage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Levine
Represented By: Denise Lynn Savage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Interactive, Inc.
Represented By: Denise Lynn Savage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adorama, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Henry Sheppe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adorama Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Matthew Henry Sheppe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Mendlowits
Represented By: Matthew Henry Sheppe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendel Mendlowits
Represented By: Matthew Henry Sheppe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]