Jones et al v. Zuckerberg et al Featured Case

Defendant: J P Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Cipora Herman, David Ebersman, Peter A. Thiel, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Reed Hastings, Donald E. Graham, James W. Breyer, Erskine B. Bowles, Marc L. Andreessen, Mark Zuckerberg, Goldman Sachs & Co and Facebook Inc.
Plaintiff: Holly McConnaughey and Gaye Jones
Case Number: 1:2013cv02830
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 12 Featured Case STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
April 30, 2013 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
April 30, 2013 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
April 30, 2013 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sjo)
April 30, 2013 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
April 30, 2013 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
April 30, 2013 11 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Delaware; Case Number: 1:13-cv-00548. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
April 29, 2013 10 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) transferring case to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, MDL No. 2389. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi, Clerk of the MDL Panel. (mmm) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/30/2013.]
April 17, 2013 9 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to MOVE, ANSWER, or otherwise respond to the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint to 30 days after resolution of Plaintiffs' forthcoming motion to remand filed by Marc L. Andreessen, James W. Breyer, David Ebersman, Peter A. Thiel, Erskine B. Bowles, Facebook Inc., Cipora Herman, Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Reed Hastings, Donald E. Graham. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/17/13. (mmm) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/30/2013.]
April 12, 2013 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to MOVE, ANSWER, or otherwise respond to the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint to 30 days after resolution of Plaintiffs' forthcoming motion to remand - filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Cipora Herman, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Waesco, Susan) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/30/2013.]
April 10, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/30/2013.]
April 8, 2013 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE: In conjunction with the disclosure statement docketed in this action (SEE DI#'s 5 & 6 ), corporate parents and other affiliates should be added to the case. The event code ADD CORPORATE AFFILIATES/PARENTS, found in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list, should be used to add this information. (rwc) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/30/2013.]
April 8, 2013 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by J P Morgan Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J P Morgan Securities LLC.. (Bouchard, Andre) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/30/2013.]
April 8, 2013 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. (Bouchard, Andre) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/30/2013.]
April 8, 2013 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Bouchard, Andre) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/30/2013.]
April 5, 2013 4 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Goldman Sachs & Co, J P Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (dmp, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/30/2013.]
April 5, 2013 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Facebook Inc.. (dmp, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/30/2013.]
April 5, 2013 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/30/2013.]
April 5, 2013 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware, Case Numbers 8375 and 8399 (Filing fee $350, receipt number 311-1263669)- filed by Donald E. Graham, Sheryl K. Sandberg, James W. Breyer, Mark Zuckerberg, David Ebersman, Erskine B. Bowles, Cipora Herman, Peter A. Thiel, Marc L. Andreessen, Reed Hastings, Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C Part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibit C Part 2 of 2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E Part 1 of 2, # 7 Exhibit E Part 2 of 2, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, ) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/30/2013.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Zuckerberg et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J P Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Andre G. Bouchard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Andre G. Bouchard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cipora Herman
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Kwoka
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ebersman
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Kwoka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Kwoka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl K. Sandberg
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Kwoka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Kwoka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Kwoka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Kwoka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Kwoka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Andreessen
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Kwoka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Kwoka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co
Represented By: Andre G. Bouchard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Kwoka
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly McConnaughey
Represented By: Michael Hanrahan
Represented By: Paul A. Fioravanti, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin H. Davenport
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaye Jones
Represented By: Michael Hanrahan
Represented By: Paul A. Fioravanti, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin H. Davenport
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]