Good Morning To You Productions Corp. v. Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. Featured Case

lawsuit over "Happy Birthday" song

Defendant: Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.
Plaintiff: Good Morning To You Productions Corp.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv04040
Filed: June 13, 2013
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Louis L. Stanton
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the termination of this action. (jno)
July 26, 2013 3 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.. Document filed by Good Morning To You Productions Corp.. (Rifkin, Mark)
June 21, 2013 2 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Janine Lee Pollack on behalf of Good Morning To You Productions Corp.. New Address: Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP, 270 Madison Avenue, New York, NY, United States 10016, 212-545-4600. (Pollack, Janine)
June 14, 2013 Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the filing of this action. (laq)
June 13, 2013 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 2 Standing Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (laq)
June 13, 2013 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
June 13, 2013 Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (laq)
June 13, 2013 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. (laq)
June 13, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1069652)Document filed by Good Morning To You Productions Corp.(laq) (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Good Morning To You Productions Corp. v. Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Good Morning To You Productions Corp.
Represented By: Janine Lee Pollack
Represented By: Randall Scott Newman
Represented By: Beth Alexandra Landes
Represented By: Giti Baghban
Represented By: Mark C. Rifkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]