Ceglia v. Zuckerberg et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Paul D. Ceglia
Defendant: Mark Elliot Zuckerberg and Facebook, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00569
Filed: July 9, 2010
 
Court: New York Western District Court
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Allegany
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Arcara
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2013 670 Featured Case AMENDED DECISION AND ORDER re 600 Declaration filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Motions terminated: 667 MOTION for Reconsideration re 660 Order filed by Paul D. Ceglia.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/10/2013. (SDW)
June 6, 2013 669 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 667 MOTION for Reconsideration re 660 Order,, filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
May 28, 2013 668 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re 664 Declaration, 663 Memorandum/Brief by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
May 23, 2013 667 MOTION for Reconsideration re 660 Order,, by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul A. Argentieri in Support of Motion for Reconsideration, etc., # 2 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
May 22, 2013 666 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 654 Objections -- non-motion,, in Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate's Report and Recommendation filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul Argentieri in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Ceglia's Objections to Magistrate's March 26, 2013 Report and Recommendation, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
May 20, 2013 665 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 664 Declaration, 663 Memorandum/Brief (Snyder, Orin)
May 20, 2013 664 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 663 Memorandum/Brief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
May 20, 2013 663 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re 660 Order,, Supplemental Fee Application by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
May 14, 2013 662 Featured Case ORDER granting 661 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 654 Objections, (Replies due by 5/22/2013); granting 661 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages not to exceed 20 pages. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 5/13/2013. (DLC)
May 11, 2013 661 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 654 Objections -- non-motion,, , MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul Argentieri, Esq. in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
May 9, 2013 660 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER. In accordance with the January 10, 2012 Decision and Order (Doc. No. 283), Defendants Fee Application is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Defendants are awarded in connection with their Accelerated Motion to Compel $ 3,747.68 in attorney's fees. Defendants are further ORDERED to file within ten (10) days, affidavits of attorney's fees and costs incurred preparing and defending the Fee Application; Plaintiff's opposition shall be filed within five (5) days thereafter. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/9/2013. (SDW)
May 6, 2013 659 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 657 Reply/Response, 658 Continuation of Exhibits, (Snyder, Orin)
May 6, 2013 658 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. to 657 Reply/Response Appendix of Selected Previously-Filed Exhibits filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Snyder, Orin)
May 6, 2013 657 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 654 Objections -- non-motion,, Opposition to Ceglia's Objections to Judge Foschio's March 26, 2013 Report and Recommendation filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
April 29, 2013 656 Sealed Document as to Docket No. 655. (DLC)
April 29, 2013 655 MOTION by Joseph M. Alioto to appear pro hac vice by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibits). PHV Fee paid $150.00, Receipt No. 0364614 (DLC) Modified on 4/29/2013 (DLC).
April 16, 2013 654 OBJECTIONS to REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (318) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, (320) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg Objections due fourteen days from receipt.(651 in 1:10-cv-00569-RJA-LGF) filed by Plaintiff Paul D. Ceglia.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Paul D. Ceglia, # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00569-RJA-LGF, 1:13-cv-00256-RJA(Argentieri, Paul)
April 9, 2013 653 TEXT ORDER: the Motion to Enlarge Time 652 and to exceed page limits on consent is granted. Plaintiff Paul D. Ceglia shall have until April 15, 2013 to file objections of up to 50 pages. Defendants shall have until May 6, 2013 to file responses of up to 50 pages. Plaintiff shall file a reply, or a notice of no reply, due May 15, 2013. The Court will schedule argument at a later date. Issued by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on April 9, 2013. (WJG)
April 9, 2013 652 MOTION for Extension of Time to File and For Additional Pages by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
March 26, 2013 651 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 318 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, 320 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Objections due fourteen days from receipt. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/26/2013. (SDW)
March 20, 2013 649 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER denying 579 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, dismissing as moot 595 Defendants' request for disclosure. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/20/2013. (SDW)
March 19, 2013 648 DECLARATION filed by Paul D. Ceglia consent to withdrawal of attorney request. (Argentieri, Paul)
March 19, 2013 647 DECLARATION filed by Paul D. Ceglia , Plaintiff (Argentieri, Paul) by. (Fogg, Robert)
March 18, 2013 646 TEXT ORDER. Based on Defendants' response (Doc. No. 644) to Mr. Argentieri's letter dated March 13, 2013 (Doc. No. 642) and Plaintiff's reply (Doc. No. 645), Plaintiff shall file his declaration pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1746 that Plaintiff no longer opposes the request of Dean Boland, Esq. for leave to withdraw as Plaintiff's counsel. Such declaration shall be filed not later than March 20, 2013 at 12:00 p.m.. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/18/2013. (SDW)
March 18, 2013 645 Letter from Paul A. Argentieri, Esq., received 3/18/2013, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio (SDW)
March 18, 2013 644 Letter from Orin Snyder, Esq., dated 3/15/2013, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio (SDW)
March 14, 2013 643 Featured Case ORDER re 642 Letter. Responses due by 3/15/2013 at 5:00 p.m. Replies due by 3/18/2013 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/14/2013. (SDW)
March 14, 2013 642 Letter from Paul Argentieri, Esq., dated 3/13/2013, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio (SDW)
January 14, 2013 641 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 640 Reply/Response, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
January 4, 2013 640 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 632 Objections -- non-motion, 633 Objections -- non-motion Opposition to Ceglias Objections to Judge Foschios November 29, 2012 Order filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
December 18, 2012 E-Filing Notification: 639 DECISION and ORDER - Main Document 639 replaced on 12/18/2012 for correction on page 3, sentence 3-deleting the word referencing) (SDW). (SDW)
December 17, 2012 639 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER denying 624 Motion for Protective Order; dismissing Government's motion to intervene 631 . Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/17/2012. (SDW) (Main Document 639 replaced on 12/18/2012) (SDW).
December 14, 2012 638 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 630 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
December 14, 2012 637 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 635 Reply/Response, 636 Declaration, (Snyder, Orin)
December 14, 2012 636 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 635 Reply/Response filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Snyder, Orin)
December 14, 2012 635 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 610 Declaration, 623 Declaration Response to Paul Argentieri's "Sur Rebuttal" Declarations filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
December 14, 2012 634 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' responses to the appeal of plaintiff 632 , 633 , from the Decision and Order 615 shall be due January 4, 2013. Plaintiff shall reply, or file a notice of no reply, due January 14, 2013. Oral argument will be at the discretion of the Court. Issued by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on December 14, 2012. (WJG)
December 13, 2012 633 OBJECTIONS to Objections -- non-motion 632 filed by Plaintiff Paul D. Ceglia.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
December 13, 2012 632 OBJECTIONS to Order on Motion for Attorney Fees 615 Notice of Objection filed by Plaintiff Paul D. Ceglia.. (Argentieri, Paul)
December 13, 2012 631 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration, #(2) Continuance).(DLC)
December 12, 2012 630 RESPONSE in Opposition re 624 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
December 7, 2012 629 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 628 Reply to Response to Motion, (Snyder, Orin)
December 7, 2012 628 REPLY to Response to Motion re 579 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney NOTICE OF MOTION - Reply Memorandum In Support Of Defendants' Request For Disclosure Of In Camera Communications filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
December 7, 2012 627 TEXT ORDER. Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's sur-rebuttals due by 12/14/2012. Plaintiff shall not file any further submissions without court approval. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/7/2012. (SDW)
December 7, 2012 626 TEXT ORDER re 624 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Responses due by 12/12/2012. Replies due by 12/14/2012. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/7/2012. (SDW)
December 6, 2012 625 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER denying 585 Motion to Intervene by James Charles Kopp. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/6/2012. (SDW)
December 5, 2012 624 MOTION for Protective Order Notice of Motion by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Memorandum in Support)(Argentieri, Paul)
December 5, 2012 623 DECLARATION signed by Paul Argentieri re 610 Declaration, filed by Paul D. Ceglia . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
December 4, 2012 622 RESPONSE in Opposition re 579 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
December 3, 2012 621 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 620 Declaration, 619 Reply to Response to Motion (Snyder, Orin)
December 3, 2012 620 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 619 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Orin)
December 3, 2012 619 REPLY to Response to Motion re 320 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
December 3, 2012 618 TEXT ORDER. By papers filed 11/26/2012, Plaintiff filed the Declaration of Paul Argentieri in Surrebuttal to Defendants' Reply To Plaintiff's Response to Their Motion To Dismiss For Fraud On The Court 610 . Defendants' response, if any, may be filed by 12/10/2012. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/3/2012. (SDW)
November 30, 2012 617 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 27, 2012, before Judge Leslie G. Foschio. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christi A. Macri, Telephone number camacri@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (DLC)
November 29, 2012 616 RESPONSE in Opposition re 599 MOTION filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
November 29, 2012 615 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 517 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/29/2012. (SDW)
November 29, 2012 614 DECLARATION signed by Dean Boland re 613 Oral Argument,,, 582 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Paul D. Ceglia . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
November 27, 2012 613 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Oral Argument held on 11/27/2012. Court holds motion to withdraw as Plaintiff's counsel in abeyance. Allows Defendants to withdraw their consent to the withdrawal pending the court's resolution of Defendants' request for disclosure of Plaintiff's in camera letters. Following decision on disclosure, court will issue briefing schedule on Plaintiff's counsel's motion to withdraw. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' request for disclosure due 12/4/2012; Defendants' reply due 12/7/2012. Appearances (all via telephone): Pltf-Dean Boland, Esq., Paul Argentieri, Esq. and Paul Ceglia; Dft-Orin Snyder, Esq., Alex Southwell, Esq., Thomas Dupree, Esq., Terry Flynn, Esq., Colin Stitch.(Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (SDW)
November 27, 2012 612 Letter from Alexander Southwell, Esq., dated 11/26/2012, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio requesting disclosure of the in camera letter from Dean Boland, Esq. (SDW)
November 27, 2012 611 DEPOSITION of Larry Stewart taken on July 11, 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Errata, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
November 26, 2012 610 DECLARATION signed by Paul Argentieri re 589 Declaration,, 588 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
November 26, 2012 609 DECLARATION signed by Paul Argentieri re 607 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 320 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Paul D. Ceglia filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
November 20, 2012 607 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 596 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 320 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Responses due by 11/25/2012. Replies due by 12/3/2012.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/20/2012. (SDW)
November 20, 2012 606 Featured Case Letter from Paul A. Argentieri, Esq., dated 11/20/2012, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio (SDW)
November 20, 2012 605 DECISION and ORDER denying 553 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/20/2012. (SDW)
November 20, 2012 604 Featured Case Letter from James Koop, dated 11/14/2012, to Judge Foschio. (DLC)
November 20, 2012 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use (Motion) event. No action required - document text changed to MOTION re 599 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin) (DLC)
November 20, 2012 603 TEXT ORDER re 602 Defendants' Letter in opposition to Plaintiff's request for an extension of time.\. Plaintiff's reply due by 11/20/2012 at 4:00 p.m. So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/20/2012. (SDW)
November 19, 2012 608 AFFIDAVIT re 585 MOTION Intervene by James Charles Kopp. (DLC)
November 19, 2012 602 Letter from Orin Snyder, Esq., dated 11/19/2012, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio in opposition to Plaintiff's request for an extension of time (Doc. No. 596). (SDW)
November 19, 2012 601 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 600 Declaration, 599 Memorandum/Brief (Snyder, Orin)
November 19, 2012 600 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 599 Memorandum/Brief filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
November 19, 2012 599 MOTION for Fee Application In Connection With Their Eighth Motion To Compel by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin) Modified on 11/20/2012 (DLC).
November 19, 2012 598 RESPONSE to Motion re 585 MOTION Intervene filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
November 16, 2012 597 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 596 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 571 Decision and Order, NOTICE OF MOTION MEMORANDUM byPaul D. Ceglia. (Argentieri, Paul)
November 16, 2012 596 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 571 Decision and Order, NOTICE OF MOTION by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
November 14, 2012 595 RESPONSE to Motion re 579 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
November 11, 2012 594 DEPOSITION of John Paul Osborn taken on August 13, 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
November 11, 2012 593 DEPOSITION of Erich Speckin taken on September 24, 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
November 11, 2012 592 DEPOSITION of Valery Aginsky taken on August 9, 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
November 11, 2012 591 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 583 Order on Motion to Strike filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
November 9, 2012 590 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 589 Declaration,, 588 Reply to Response to Motion (Snyder, Orin)
November 9, 2012 589 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 588 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Snyder, Orin)
November 9, 2012 588 REPLY to Response to Motion re 318 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
November 9, 2012 587 NOTICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 584 Order on Motion to Compel, Notice of Compliance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
November 8, 2012 586 Featured Case ORDER re 585 MOTION Intervene filed by James Charles Kopp. Responses due by 11/19/2012. Replies due by 11/29/2012. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/8/2012. (SDW)
November 7, 2012 584 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 511 Motion to Compel; granting 521 Motion to Compel. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/7/2012. (SDW)
November 5, 2012 585 MOTION to Intervene by Charles Kopp.(DLC)
October 31, 2012 583 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER denying 499 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff ordered to file any rebuttal expert reports within 10 days. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/31/2012. (SDW)
October 30, 2012 Remark. Copy of Doc. No. 582 was mailed to Plaintiff in care of Paul A. Argentieri, 188 Main Street, Hornell, New York, 14843 via United States Postal Service. (SDW)
October 30, 2012 582 Featured Case ORDER re 579 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Responses due by 11/14/2012. Replies due by 11/21/2012. Oral Argument set for 11/27/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/30/2012. (SDW)
October 30, 2012 581 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to 579 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney NOTICE OF MOTION, 580 Memorandum in Support . (Boland, Dean)
October 30, 2012 580 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 579 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney NOTICE OF MOTION byPaul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
October 30, 2012 579 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney NOTICE OF MOTION by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
October 26, 2012 578 REPLY to Response to Motion re 553 MOTION for Discovery filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
October 24, 2012 577 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 553 MOTION for Discovery CORRECTED/AMENDED filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit)(Boland, Dean)
October 19, 2012 576 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 575 Declaration of Larry Stewart (Boland, Dean)
October 19, 2012 575 DECLARATION signed by Larry Stewart re 574 Declaration, 573 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, E-Filing Notification No Signature, E-Filing Notification No Proof Of Service filed by Paul D. Ceglia Signed Version Filed. (Boland, Dean)
October 19, 2012 E-Filing Notification: Document missing attorneys electronic signature. Action required: re-file document with proper signature and proof of service. Re 574 DECLARATION. (filed by Boland, Dean) (DLC)
October 18, 2012 574 DECLARATION signed by Larry Stewart re 573 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
October 18, 2012 573 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 553 MOTION for Discovery filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
October 17, 2012 572 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER granting 474 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/17/2012. (SDW)
October 16, 2012 571 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER. The schedule for the filing of Defendants' reply as set forth in Doc. No. 542 at 3, is amended as follows: Defendants' reply shall be filed two weeks following Plaintiff's full compliance with the court's determination of Defendants' Eighth and Ninth Motions to Compel in the event the court should grant Defendants' motions, or one week from the denial of Defendants motions.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/16/2012. (SDW)
October 16, 2012 570 Letter from Dean Boland, Esq., dated 10-16-2012, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio (SDW)
October 16, 2012 569 Letter from Alexander H. Southwell, Esq., dated 10/11/2012, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio (SDW)
October 10, 2012 568 TEXT ORDER. On September 5, 2012, Defendants filed their Eighth Motion to Compel (Doc. No. 511) seeking to compel Plaintiff to produce three communications referred to as the March 30 Capsicum Communication, the April 12 Kasowitz Letter, and the April 12 Vacco Letter or, alternatively, requesting in camera inspection of these same three communications. The record indicates that each of these disputed documents appears to have been dated in 2011. Upon reviewing the papers, the court finds in camera inspection will facilitate resolution of the motion. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit, for in camera inspection, the March 30 Capsicum Communication, the April 12 Kasowitz Letter, and the April 12 Vacco Letter, by close of business on Monday, October 15, 2012. SO ORDERED. Entered by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/10/2012. (TAH)
October 9, 2012 567 Letter from Alexander H. Southwell, Esq., dated 10/8/2012, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio re: Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Response regarding Motion to Strike New Expert Report. (SDW)
October 2, 2012 566 TEXT ORDER granting 565 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [321}. See Doc. No. 565 for specific deadlines. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/2/2012. (SDW)
October 1, 2012 565 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 320 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
October 1, 2012 564 TEXT ORDER re 553 MOTION for Discovery filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 10/19/2012. Replies due by 10/26/2012. Oral argument at the discretion of court. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/1/2012. (SDW)
September 28, 2012 563 REPLY to Response to Motion re 499 MOTION to Strike 472 Declaration, RE-FILING OF NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SIGNATURE PER CLERK'S OFFICE filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
September 28, 2012 562 REPLY to Response to Motion re 521 Ninth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
September 28, 2012 561 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 559 Reply to Response to Motion, 560 Declaration (Snyder, Orin)
September 28, 2012 560 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 559 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
September 28, 2012 559 REPLY to Response to Motion re 517 MOTION for Attorney Fees And For Recovery Of Expenses filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 28, 2012 558 REPLY to Response to Motion re 474 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
September 27, 2012 557 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 554 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 556 Declaration, 555 Declaration,,, 553 MOTION for Discovery (Snyder, Orin)
September 27, 2012 556 DECLARATION signed by Amanda M. Aycock re 553 MOTION for Discovery filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Snyder, Orin)
September 27, 2012 555 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 553 MOTION for Discovery filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN)(Snyder, Orin)
September 27, 2012 554 MEMORANDUM in Support re 553 MOTION for Discovery filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 27, 2012 553 MOTION for Discovery by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
September 24, 2012 552 DECLARATION signed by Dean Boland re 551 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
September 24, 2012 551 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 517 MOTION for Attorney Fees And For Recovery Of Expenses filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
September 21, 2012 550 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 549 Declaration, 548 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Snyder, Orin)
September 21, 2012 549 DECLARATION signed by Amanda M. Aycock re 548 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
September 21, 2012 548 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 499 MOTION to Strike 472 Declaration, RE-FILING OF NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SIGNATURE PER CLERK'S OFFICE filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 21, 2012 547 TEXT ORDER re 517 MOTION for Attorney Fees And For Recovery Of Expenses filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, 521 Ninth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/24/2012. Replies due by 9/28/2012. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/21/2012. (SDW)
September 20, 2012 546 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 545 Declaration, 544 Reply to Response to Motion (Snyder, Orin)
September 20, 2012 545 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 544 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Orin)
September 20, 2012 544 REPLY to Response to Motion re 511 Eighth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 14, 2012 543 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 521 Ninth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
September 14, 2012 542 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER granting 525 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 318 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 10/15/2012 or two weeks following Plaintiff's full compliance with the courts determination of Defendants' Eighth and Ninth Motions to Compel (Doc. No. 511 and 521) now pending before the court, should the court grant either or both of Defendants' motions. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/14/2012. (SDW)
September 14, 2012 541 DECLARATION signed by Jason Holmberg re 540 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
September 14, 2012 540 RESPONSE in Opposition re 511 Eighth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
September 13, 2012 539 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 537 Reply to Response to Motion, 538 Declaration (Snyder, Orin)
September 13, 2012 538 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 537 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
September 13, 2012 537 REPLY to Response to Motion re 525 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 318) filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 12, 2012 536 DECLARATION signed by Paul Argentieri re 534 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Paul D. Ceglia, Dean Boland filed by Paul D. Ceglia, Dean Boland. (Boland, Dean)
September 12, 2012 535 DECLARATION signed by Paul Ceglia re 534 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Paul D. Ceglia, Dean Boland filed by Paul D. Ceglia, Dean Boland. (Boland, Dean)
September 12, 2012 534 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 525 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 318) filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
September 12, 2012 533 TEXT ORDER re 517 MOTION for Attorney Fees And For Recovery Of Expenses filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, 521 Ninth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/22/2012. Replies due by 9/27/2012. Oral argument at discretion of the court. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/12/2012. (SDW)
September 12, 2012 532 TEXT ORDER re 511 Eighth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/17/2012. Replies due by 9/20/2012. Oral argument at discretion of the court. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/12/2012. (SDW)
September 12, 2012 531 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' letter request of 9/10/2012 to file a Reply Memorandum not to exceed thirty-five pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/12/2012. (SDW)
September 11, 2012 530 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 529 Reply/Response (Snyder, Orin)
September 11, 2012 529 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 507 Declaration, 506 Objections -- non-motion, 508 Declaration filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 10, 2012 528 TEXT ORDER re 525 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 318) filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/12/2012 at 4:00 p.m. Replies due by 9/13/2012 at 4:00 p.m. Oral argument at discretion of the court. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/10/2012. (SDW)
September 10, 2012 527 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 526 Declaration, 525 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 318) (Snyder, Orin)
September 10, 2012 526 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 525 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 318) filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
September 10, 2012 525 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 318) by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
September 7, 2012 524 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 523 Declaration, 521 Ninth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief, 522 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Snyder, Orin)
September 7, 2012 523 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwall re 521 Ninth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Orin)
September 7, 2012 522 MEMORANDUM in Support re 521 Ninth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 7, 2012 521 Ninth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
September 7, 2012 520 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 517 MOTION for Attorney Fees And For Recovery Of Expenses, 519 Declaration,, 518 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Snyder, Orin)
September 7, 2012 519 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 517 MOTION for Attorney Fees And For Recovery Of Expenses filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Snyder, Orin)
September 7, 2012 518 MEMORANDUM in Support re 517 MOTION for Attorney Fees And For Recovery Of Expenses filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 7, 2012 517 MOTION for Attorney Fees And For Recovery Of Expenses by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
September 6, 2012 516 DECLARATION signed by Dean Boland re 515 Reply/Response filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
September 6, 2012 515 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 503 Memorandum/Brief filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
September 5, 2012 514 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 513 Declaration, 512 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 511 Eighth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief (Snyder, Orin)
September 5, 2012 513 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 511 Eighth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Snyder, Orin)
September 5, 2012 512 MEMORANDUM in Support re 511 Eighth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 5, 2012 511 Eighth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
September 5, 2012 Sanctions/Contempt Fines paid: $1000.00, receipt number 031216 by Paul Ceglia. (DLC)
September 5, 2012 Sanctions/Contempt Fines paid: $1000.00, receipt number 031217 by Dan Boland. (DLC)
August 30, 2012 510 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's request to file an overlength memorandum of law in support of his response to Defendants' motion to dismiss of 65 pages.So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/30/2012. (SDW)
August 29, 2012 509 TEXT ORDER re 499 MOTION to Strike 472 Declaration, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Responses due by 9/21/2012. Replies due by 9/28/2012. Oral argument at discretion of the court. So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/29/2012. (SDW)
August 28, 2012 508 DECLARATION signed by Jason Holmberg re 506 Objections -- non-motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Argentieri, Paul)
August 28, 2012 507 DECLARATION signed by Jerry Grant re 506 Objections -- non-motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Argentieri, Paul)
August 28, 2012 506 OBJECTIONS to Order on Motion to Compel 478 filed by Plaintiff Paul D. Ceglia.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
August 27, 2012 505 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 503 Memorandum/Brief, 504 Declaration (Snyder, Orin)
August 27, 2012 504 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 503 Memorandum/Brief filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Southwell, Alexander)
August 27, 2012 503 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re 478 Order on Motion to Compel In Support Of Fee Application In Connection With Their Seventh Motion To Compel by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
August 23, 2012 502 RESPONSE in Opposition re 318 MOTION to Dismiss RE-File for signature mismatch per clerk's office filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
August 22, 2012 501 RESPONSE in Opposition re 474 MOTION for Protective Order RE-FILING FOR SIGNATURE ISSUE PER CLERK'S OFFICE filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
August 22, 2012 500 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 499 MOTION to Strike 472 Declaration, RE-FILING OF NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SIGNATURE PER CLERK'S OFFICE RE-FILING FOR SIGNATURE PER CLERK'S OFFICE byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
August 22, 2012 499 MOTION to Strike 472 Declaration, RE-FILING OF NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SIGNATURE PER CLERK'S OFFICE by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Argentieri, Paul)
August 22, 2012 E-Filing Notification: Username and signature do not match (refer to Administrative Procedures Guide Section 1-3c). Action required: re-file documents using same signature and password and file updated proof of service. Re 494 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by filed by (Boland, Dean), and 493 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by (Boland, Dean), and 492 MOTION to Strike 472 Declaration filed by (Boland, Dean) incorrectly signed by Paul A. Argentieri. (DLC)
August 22, 2012 498 DEPOSITION of Bryan Rose taken on July 18, 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 497 DEPOSITION of Gerald LaPorte taken on July 26, 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 496 DEPOSITION of Michael McGowan taken on July 19. 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 495 DEPOSITION of Neil Broom taken on June 28, 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 494 RESPONSE in Opposition re 474 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 493 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 492 MOTION to Strike 472 Declaration, NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE byPaul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 492 MOTION to Strike 472 Declaration, NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 491 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to 487 Deposition Exhibit 53. (Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 490 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to 487 Deposition Exhibit 52. (Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 489 DEPOSITION of John Paul Osborn taken on August 13, 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 488 DEPOSITION of Albert Lyter taken on August 10, 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 487 DEPOSITION of Hany Farid taken on August 13, 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 486 DEPOSITION of Valery Aginsky taken on August 9, 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 485 DEPOSITION of Peter Tytell taken on August 3, 2012 by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 484 DECLARATION signed by Paul Argentieri re 481 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 483 DECLARATION signed by Arthur Kleinfeldt re 481 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 482 DECLARATION signed by Paul Ceglia re 481 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
August 21, 2012 481 RESPONSE in Opposition re 318 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
August 15, 2012 480 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER affirming Magistrate Judge Foschio's April 19, 2012 Decision and Order in its entirety. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 8/15/2012. (JMB)
August 15, 2012 479 TEXT ORDER re 474 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/21/2012. Replies due by 9/28/2012. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/15/2012. (SDW)
August 15, 2012 478 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER granting 462 Seventh Motion to Compel. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/15/2012. (SDW)
August 10, 2012 477 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 475 Memorandum in Support, 474 MOTION for Protective Order, 476 Declaration, (Snyder, Orin)
August 10, 2012 476 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 474 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Snyder, Orin)
August 10, 2012 475 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 474 MOTION for Protective Order byFacebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
August 10, 2012 474 MOTION for Protective Order by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
August 9, 2012 473 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 472 Declaration, (Snyder, Orin)
August 9, 2012 472 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 318 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit D to Lesnevich Supplemental Report (Exhibit A), # 3 Exhibit E to Lesnevich Supplemental Report (Exhibit A))(Snyder, Orin)
August 6, 2012 471 TEXT ORDER re 468 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Modify Minute and Order (Doc. No. 348) on Consent of All Parties filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Based on the parties' joint request and the supporting affidavit of Alexander H. Southwell, Esq., the parties' request to extend by 10 days the deadlines established by the court's scheduling order for completion of expert depositions and the filing of Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motions to dismiss and Defendants' replies is GRANTED. Entered by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 08/06/2012. (TAH)
August 3, 2012 470 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 469 Declaration, 468 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Modify Minute and Order (Doc. No. 348) on Consent of All Parties (Snyder, Orin)
August 3, 2012 469 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 468 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Modify Minute and Order (Doc. No. 348) on Consent of All Parties filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
August 3, 2012 468 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Modify Minute and Order (Doc. No. 348) on Consent of All Parties by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
July 24, 2012 467 REPLY to Response to Motion re 462 Seventh MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
July 20, 2012 466 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 462 Seventh MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit REDACTED)(Boland, Dean)
July 19, 2012 465 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 460 Reply/Response Reply to Ceglia's Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
July 12, 2012 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use (Memorandum in Support) event. No action required. Re 461 Seventh MOTION to Compel. Docket changed to reflect that document is a Memorandum and not a Motion. (DLC)
July 11, 2012 464 TEXT ORDER. On July 11, 2012, Defendants filed their Seventh Motion to Compel (Doc. No. 461), seeking Plaintiff's compliance with this court's directive contained in the June 28, 2012 Decision and Order (Doc. No. 457), that Plaintiff produce within ten days a document referred to as "the Kasowitz Letter." Plaintiff's response to the motion shall be filed not later than July 20, 2012, and shall include as an exhibit a copy of Privilege Log Item 379 and all attachments that Plaintiff was ordered to produce to Defendants, including, as referenced on page 12 of Item 379, as an attachment to an April 13, 2011 email from Aaron Marks of the law firm of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP to Plaintiffs attorneys, "a letter responding to Mr. Vacco's communication of last evening and certain documents that are referenced in the letter," and all attachment to such letter, i.e., the "certain documents that are referenced in the letter." Defendants' reply shall be filed not later than July 24, 2012. Oral argument shall be conducted at the court's discretion. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/11/2012. (SDW)
July 11, 2012 463 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 462 Seventh MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief, 461 Seventh MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief (Snyder, Orin)
July 11, 2012 462 Seventh MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
July 11, 2012 461 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of Seventh MOTION to Compel by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin) Modified on 7/12/2012 (DLC).
July 9, 2012 460 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 457 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel,,,,,,,,,, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
July 2, 2012 459 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Paul D. Ceglia. Amendment to 456 Order on Motion to Strike,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-15, # 2 Exhibit 16-20, # 3 Exhibit 21-37, # 4 Exhibit 38 Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 38 Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 38 Part 3, # 7 Exhibit 39-50, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
June 28, 2012 458 TEXT ORDER. Based on the court's Decision and Order 451 and for the reasons stated in Defendants' opposition 453 , Plaintiff's 441 Motion to Strike is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/28/2012. (SDW)
June 28, 2012 457 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER granting 381 Motion to Compel; denying 385 Motion to Strike ; denying 389 Motion to Compel; denying 396 Motion for Discovery; denying 426 motion to vacate; denying 437 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Plaintiff is ordered to produce the Kasowitz Letter within ten (10) days of this Decision and Order. Plaintiff is further ordered to show cause, within ten (10) days of this Decision and Order, why he should not be sanctioned for filing the Motion to Strike (Doc. No. 385), First Motion to Compel (Doc. No. 389), Motion for Discovery (Doc. No. 396), Motion to Vacate (Doc. No. 426), and Motion to Disqualify Counsel (Doc. No. 437).. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/28/2012. (SDW)
June 26, 2012 456 TEXT ORDER. Based on the papers filed by the parties in connection with Plaintiff's motion 445 the motion is granted. Declaration filed 6/4/2012 415 is stricken from the record and Plaintiff is directed to file a substitute document with proper redaction in conformity with the Court's protective order as soon as possible. So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/26/2012. (SDW)
June 25, 2012 455 REPLY to Response to Motion re 445 MOTION to Strike 415 Declaration, NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
June 25, 2012 454 REPLY to Response to Motion re 426 MOTION to Vacate 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
June 22, 2012 453 RESPONSE in Opposition re 441 MOTION to Strike NOTICE of MOTION filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
June 22, 2012 452 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 437 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel NOTICE filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
June 20, 2012 451 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER. Plaintiff's requests for a stay of discovery, as stated in Doc. Nos. 426 and 437 are DENIED. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/20/2012. (SDW)
June 20, 2012 450 TEXT ORDER. By papers filed 6/19/2012 (Doc. No. 445), Plaintiff moves for (1) an order striking Doc. No. 415 and all related exhibits, and (2) an order authorizing Plaintiff to re-file Doc. No. 415 with redacted exhibits ("Plaintiffs motion"). Defendants do not oppose Plaintiff's motion (Doc. No. 448) but request the court order Plaintiff to provide further information relating to Plaintiff's compliance with applicable confidentiality requirements and Plaintiffs remedial action in response to the unredacted filing under Doc. No. 415. Id. ("Defendants requests"). Plaintiff's reply to Defendants' request shall be filed not later than 6/25/2012; Defendants' surreply may be filed not later than 6/29/2012. Oral argument shall be conducted at the court's discretion. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/20/2012. (SDW)
June 20, 2012 449 TEXT ORDER re 441 MOTION to Strike NOTICE of MOTION filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Responses due by 6/22/2012. Replies due by 6/25/2012. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/20/2012. (SDW)
June 20, 2012 448 RESPONSE to Motion re 445 MOTION to Strike 415 Declaration, NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
June 20, 2012 447 Letter from Orin Snyder, Esq., dated 6/19/2012, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio re: Plaintiff's motion to disqualify. (SDW)
June 19, 2012 446 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 445 MOTION to Strike 415 Declaration, NOTICE OF MOTION byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
June 19, 2012 445 MOTION to Strike 415 Declaration, NOTICE OF MOTION by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
June 19, 2012 444 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Paul D. Ceglia. to 442 Memorandum in Support, 443 Continuation of Exhibits filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
June 19, 2012 443 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Paul D. Ceglia. to 442 Memorandum in Support EXHIBIT A filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
June 19, 2012 442 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 441 MOTION to Strike NOTICE of MOTION to Strike pleading filed by letter to court on June 19, 2012 byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
June 19, 2012 441 MOTION to Strike NOTICE of MOTION by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
June 18, 2012 440 REPLY to Response to Motion re 426 MOTION to Vacate 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
June 18, 2012 439 TEXT ORDER re 437 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel NOTICE filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Responses due by 6/22/2012. Replies due by 6/25/2012. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/18/2012. (SDW)
June 16, 2012 438 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 437 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel NOTICE byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
June 16, 2012 437 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel NOTICE by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
June 15, 2012 436 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 435 Declaration, 434 Reply to Response to Motion (Snyder, Orin)
June 15, 2012 435 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 434 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
June 15, 2012 434 REPLY to Response to Motion re 381 Sixth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
June 15, 2012 433 RESPONSE in Opposition re 426 MOTION to Vacate 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
June 11, 2012 432 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 381 Sixth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit A)(Boland, Dean)
June 11, 2012 431 TEXT ORDER granting 429 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 426 MOTION to Vacate 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument. Responses due by 6/15/2012. Replies due by 6/19/2012.SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/11/2012. (SDW)
June 11, 2012 430 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 429 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 427 Memorandum in Support, 426 MOTION to Vacate 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, NOTICE OF MOTION, 428 Text Order, Set Dea MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 427 Memorandum in Support, 426 MOTION to Vacate 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, NOTICE OF MOTION, 428 Text Order, Set Dea filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
June 10, 2012 429 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 427 Memorandum in Support, 426 MOTION to Vacate 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, NOTICE OF MOTION, 428 Text Order, Set Deadlines,, by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
June 8, 2012 428 TEXT ORDER re 426 MOTION to Vacate 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument, NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Responses due by 6/12/2012. Replies due by 6/14/2012. Oral argument at discretion of court. So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/8/2012. (SDW)
June 8, 2012 427 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
June 8, 2012 426 MOTION to Vacate 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, NOTICE OF MOTION by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
June 6, 2012 425 REPLY to Response to Motion re 389 First MOTION to Compel Defendants - NOTICE, 385 MOTION to Strike 318 MOTION to Dismiss, 326 Continuation of Exhibits, 319 Memorandum in Support of Motion NOTICE, 396 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
June 5, 2012 424 Letter from Orin Snyder, Esq., dated 6/4/2012, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio confirming Defendants received the $92,637.79 from Plaintiff. The court's Order to Show Cause 371 is discharged. (SDW)
June 5, 2012 423 TEXT ORDER. On May 30, 2012, Plaintiffs attorneys, Sanford P. Dumain, Esq., Jennifer L. Young, Esq., and Melissa R. Clark, Esq. of Millberg, LLP and Robert B. Calihan, Esq. of Calihan Law PLLC and Peter K. Skivington, Esq. of Jones & Skivington, moved to withdraw pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.2(d)(1) 395 , together with the Declaration of Sanford P. Duman in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed under seal for in camera review. By papers files May 20, 2012 405 , Plaintiffs remaining attorneys, Dean Boland, Esq. and Paul Argentieri, Esq., indicated their agreement to the motion, in accordance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83(d)(2). Defendants Response to Ceglias Counsels Motion to Withdraw was filed on June 1, 2012 409 . Based on the foregoing, including consideration of the Dumain Declaration, the Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. Plaintiff is, however, cautioned that any request for enlargements of time in connection with discovery or other matters in the prosecution of this action based on the need to retain new counsel or enable newly appearing counsel to familiarize counsel with the case will, based on the authorities cited in Defendants Response, be view with disfavor by the court. Attorney Sanford P. Dumain; Peter K. Skivington; Jennifer Leigh Young Robert B. Calihan and Melissa Ryan Clark terminated. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/5/2012. (SDW)
June 5, 2012 E-Filing Notification: Document missing signature. Action required: re-file document with proper signature and new proof of service. Re 420 DECLARATION by Paul Ceglia. (Boland, Dean) (DLC)
June 4, 2012 422 DECLARATION signed by Paul Ceglia filed by Paul D. Ceglia Regarding Plaintiff's Expert Reports. (Boland, Dean)
June 4, 2012 421 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, 414 Declaration Expert Report of Walter Rantanen. (Boland, Dean)
June 4, 2012 420 DECLARATION signed by Paul Ceglia re 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, 414 Declaration filed by Paul D. Ceglia Regarding Plaintiff's Expert Reports. (Boland, Dean)
June 4, 2012 419 DECLARATION signed by Carmine Ceglia re 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, 414 Declaration filed by Paul D. Ceglia Regarding Plaintiff's Expert Reports. (Boland, Dean)
June 4, 2012 418 DECLARATION signed by Jerry Grant re 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, 414 Declaration filed by Paul D. Ceglia Expert Report. (Boland, Dean)
June 4, 2012 417 DECLARATION signed by Neil Broom re 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, 414 Declaration filed by Paul D. Ceglia Expert Report. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Boland, Dean)
June 4, 2012 416 DECLARATION signed by Larry Stewart re 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, 414 Declaration filed by Paul D. Ceglia Expert Report. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement 46-55, # 2 Supplement 56-66, # 3 Supplement 67-90, # 4 Exhibit p. 1-82, # 5 Exhibit p. 83-167, # 6 Exhibit p. 168-229, # 7 Exhibit p. 230-290)(Boland, Dean)
June 4, 2012 415 DECLARATION signed by James Blanco re 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, 414 Declaration filed by Paul D. Ceglia Expert Report. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-15, # 2 Exhibit 16-20, # 3 Exhibit 21-37, # 4 Exhibit 38 - Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 38 - Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 38 - Part 3, # 7 Exhibit 39-50)(Boland, Dean)
June 4, 2012 414 DECLARATION signed by Dean Boland re 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Dean Boland Summary of Plaintiff's Expert Reports. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
June 4, 2012 413 RESPONSE in Opposition re 389 First MOTION to Compel Defendants - NOTICE, 385 MOTION to Strike 318 MOTION to Dismiss, 326 Continuation of Exhibits, 319 Memorandum in Support of Motion NOTICE, 396 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
June 4, 2012 412 REPLY to Response to Motion re 395 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Sanford P. Dumain. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Calihan, Robert)
June 1, 2012 411 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 410 Declaration, 409 Response to Motion (Snyder, Orin)
June 1, 2012 410 DECLARATION signed by Amanda M. Aycock re 409 Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Orin)
June 1, 2012 409 RESPONSE to Motion re 395 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
May 31, 2012 408 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER. Plaintiff's request to extend the time for filing Plaintiff's expert reports, June 3, 2012, (Doc. No. 391) is DENIED. Plaintiff's alternative request for leave to amend or supplement such reports following deposition of Plaintiffs motion to compel is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/31/2012. (SDW)
May 31, 2012 407 RESPONSE in Opposition re 391 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Motion filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
May 31, 2012 406 TEXT ORDER re 381 Sixth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 6/11/2012. Replies due by 6/15/2012. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/31/2012. (SDW)
May 30, 2012 405 STIPULATION re 403 Text Order, Set Deadlines,,,, Endorsing Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Counsel by Dean Boland. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
May 30, 2012 404 TEXT ORDER re 389 First MOTION to Compel Defendants - NOTICE filed by Paul D. Ceglia, 385 MOTION to Strike MOTION to Dismiss, Continuation of Exhibits, Memorandum in Support of Motion NOTICE filed by Paul D. Ceglia, 396 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Responses due by 6/4/2012. Replies due by 6/6/2012. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/30/2012. (SDW)
May 30, 2012 403 TEXT ORDER. Defendants and Dean M. Boland and Paul A. Argentieri, Esqs., shall file their respective responses to Doc. No. 395, a motion to withdraw, filed May 30, 2012, by Plaintiffs other attorneys of record pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.2(d)(1) or file their respective signatures agreeing to such withdrawal as a stipulation of withdrawal pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.2(d)(2) not later than 6/1/2012; movants shall file any reply not later than 6/4/2012.So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/30/2012. (SDW)
May 30, 2012 402 TEXT ORDER. Based on the court's Text Order filed 5/30/2012 399 , Plaintiff's motion 393 Motion to Strike is DISMISSED as moot. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/30/2012. (SDW)
May 30, 2012 401 Featured Case ORDER denying 372 Defendants' Motion for Clarification of the Court's Order Regarding Discovery on Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/30/2012. (SDW)
May 30, 2012 400 TEXT ORDER re 371 Order to Show Cause(Show Cause Order), entered on May 3, 2012, pursuant to which Plaintiff was given 14 days to either pay Defendants attorneys fees of $ 75,776.70 awarded by the February 14, 2012 Decision and Order (Doc. No. 292), and $ 16,851.09 awarded by the May 3, 2012 Decision and Order (Doc. No. 370), or demonstrate why such payment was not possible. On May 25, 2012, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Payment of Attorneys Fees (Doc. No. 388) (Payment Notice), advising that on May 16, 2012, Plaintiff paid to Defendants the total sum of $ 92,627.79 as attorneys fees ordered to be paid by this court in Doc. No. 371. Payment Notice at 1. Plaintiff maintains the filing of the Payment Notice was necessitated by the failure of Defendants legal counsel to confirm receipt of the wire transfer of these funds which were sent and presumed received by Defendants on May 16, 2012. Id. Defendants have not filed anything in response to the Payment Notice nor otherwise disputed Plaintiffs contentions therein. Accordingly, Defendants are requested to advise the undersigned, in writing, by the close of business Monday, June 4, 2012, whether, as Plaintiff asserts, Defendants have received $ 92,627.79 from Plaintiff and, if so, whether the request contained in Defendants Supplemental Fee Application (Doc. No. 299) (Supplemental Fee Application), that Plaintiffs payment of Defendants attorneys fees be made within 14 days of the order granting the Supplemental Fee Application or the action would be dismissed, should be deemed withdrawn or dismissed as moot, and the Show Cause Order vacated as moot.SO ORDERED. Entered by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/30/2012. (TAH)
May 30, 2012 399 TEXT ORDER re 391 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Defendants' responses due by 5/31/2012 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/30/2012. (SDW)
May 30, 2012 398 DECLARATION signed by Paul Ceglia re 397 Memorandum in Support, 396 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
May 30, 2012 397 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 396 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion For Discovery of Harvard emails byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
May 30, 2012 396 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
May 30, 2012 395 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sanford P. Dumain. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dumain, Sanford)
May 30, 2012 394 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 393 MOTION to Strike NOTICE Defendants' Responses to Doc. Nos.386, 390, 392. byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
May 30, 2012 393 MOTION to Strike NOTICE by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
May 29, 2012 392 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
May 29, 2012 391 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Motion by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
May 27, 2012 390 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, 389 First MOTION to Compel Defendants - NOTICE, 83 Order byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
May 27, 2012 389 First MOTION to Compel Defendants - NOTICE by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
May 25, 2012 388 NOTICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 371 Order to Show Cause, of Timely Payment of Attorneys Fees as Ordered (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
May 25, 2012 387 DECLARATION signed by Nathan Shaman re 318 MOTION to Dismiss, 319 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
May 24, 2012 386 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 385 MOTION to Strike 318 MOTION to Dismiss, 326 Continuation of Exhibits, 319 Memorandum in Support of Motion NOTICE byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
May 24, 2012 385 MOTION to Strike 318 MOTION to Dismiss, 326 Continuation of Exhibits, 319 Memorandum in Support of Motion NOTICE by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
May 24, 2012 384 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 381 Sixth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief, 383 Declaration, 382 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Snyder, Orin)
May 24, 2012 383 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 381 Sixth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Snyder, Orin)
May 24, 2012 382 MEMORANDUM in Support re 381 Sixth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
May 24, 2012 381 Sixth MOTION to Compel And For Other Relief by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
May 18, 2012 380 REPLY to Response to Motion re 372 MOTION Clarification re 366 Decision and Order, filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
May 16, 2012 379 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 367 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
May 16, 2012 378 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 377 Amended Document, 376 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Boland, Dean)
May 16, 2012 377 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Paul D. Ceglia. Amendment to 376 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Clarification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Boland, Dean)
May 16, 2012 376 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 372 MOTION Clarification re 366 Decision and Order, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Boland, Dean)
May 11, 2012 375 TEXT ORDER re 372 MOTION Clarification re 366 Decision and Order, filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Plaintiff's Responses due by 5/16/2012. Defendants' replies due by 5/18/2012. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/11/2012. (SDW)
May 8, 2012 374 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 372 MOTION Clarification re 366 Decision and Order,, 373 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Snyder, Orin)
May 8, 2012 373 MEMORANDUM in Support re 372 MOTION Clarification re 366 Decision and Order, filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
May 8, 2012 372 MOTION Clarification re 366 Decision and Order, by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
May 3, 2012 371 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ORDERED to, within fourteen (14) days of receipt of this Order to Show Cause, either pay the attorney's fees of $75,776.70 awarded Defendants by the February 14, 2012 Decision and Order (Doc. No. 292), and the attorneys fees of $16,851.09 awarded by the May 3, 2012 Decision and Order (Doc. No. 370), or demonstrate why such payment is not possible. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/3/2012. (SDW)
May 3, 2012 370 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER. Defendants are awarded on the Supplemental Fee Application $16,851.09 for attorney's fees incurred preparing and defending the Initial Fee Application. Defendants' request that Plaintiff be directed to make such payment within two weeks is DENIED. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/3/2012. (SDW)
May 2, 2012 369 Letter from Orin Snyder, Esq., dated 4/17/2012, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Response to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Supplemental Fee Application. (SDW)
May 1, 2012 368 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate Judge's April 19, 2012 Order 367 shall be filed by May 16, 2012. Plaintiff may file a reply by May 30, 2012. Oral argument will be at the discretion of the Court. Issued by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on May 1, 2012. (MLM)
April 30, 2012 367 Featured Case APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Paul D. Ceglia re 361 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 357 Decision and Order (Dumain, Sanford)
April 30, 2012 366 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER. Upon consideration of the argument set forth by Plaintiff and Defendants on the issue of discovery, Defendants' Motion to Stay as to Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings, is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part, with Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings converted to a motion for partial summary judgment on the issues of statute of limitations and laches. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/30/2012. (SDW)
April 30, 2012 365 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER denying 362 Motion to Stay. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/30/2012. (SDW)
April 30, 2012 364 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 363 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Snyder, Orin)
April 30, 2012 363 RESPONSE in Opposition re 362 MOTION to Stay re 357 Decision and Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND INCORPORATED MOTION FOR A PARTIAL STAY OF THE MAGISTRATE'S APRIL 19, 2012 ORDER (Expedited Treatment Requested) MOTION to Stay re 357 Decision and Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND INCORPORATED MOTION FOR A PARTIAL STAY OF THE MAGISTRATE'S APRIL 19, 2012 ORDER (Expedited Treatment Requested) filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
April 27, 2012 362 MOTION to Stay re 357 Decision and Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND INCORPORATED MOTION FOR A PARTIAL STAY OF THE MAGISTRATE'S APRIL 19, 2012 ORDER (Expedited Treatment Requested) by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dumain, Sanford)
April 26, 2012 361 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for clarification (Doc. No. 358), treated as a motion for reconsideration of the April 19, 2012 D&O, is DENIED. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/26/2012. (SDW)
April 25, 2012 360 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 349 Memorandum in Support, 353 Memorandum in Opposition Reply in Support of Discovery on Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Young, Jennifer)
April 24, 2012 359 TEXT ORDER re 358 MOTION Notice of Motion and Incorporated Motion for Clarification re 357 Decision and Order filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Defendants' response, if any, due by 4/25/2012 at 5:00 p.m. So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/24/2012. (SDW)
April 23, 2012 358 MOTION Notice of Motion and Incorporated Motion for Clarification re 357 Decision and Order by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Young, Jennifer)
April 19, 2012 357 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER re 294 Fifth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/19/2012. (SDW)
April 19, 2012 356 TEXT ORDER: defendants' response to the objections of plaintiff Ceglia to the Order of the Magistrate Judge 348 , as modified on April 6, 2012, and a reply by the plaintiff, will be scheduled after the Magistrate Judge rules on whether additional discovery is necessary 349 , 352 . Issued by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on April 19, 2012. (WJG)
April 18, 2012 355 Featured Case APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Paul D. Ceglia re 348 Order on Motion to Stay, Scheduling Conference, Oral Argument,,,,,,,,,,,, E-Filing Notification (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Young, Jennifer)
April 18, 2012 354 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 353 Memorandum in Opposition (Snyder, Orin)
April 18, 2012 353 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re 349 Memorandum in Support of Discovery on Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
April 17, 2012 352 TEXT ORDER re 349 Memorandum in Support filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Defendants' Response due by 4/24/2012. So Ordered. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/17/2012. (SDW)
April 13, 2012 351 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re 338 Text Order, In Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Attorney Fee Application by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
April 12, 2012 350 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 4, 2012, before Judge Leslie G. Foschio. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mjichelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2012. (DLC)
April 11, 2012 349 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 345 Response in Opposition to Motion byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
April 6, 2012 E-Filing Notification: 348 Minute and Order. Modified to clarify Plaintiff has 60 days to file experts reports.(SDW)
April 4, 2012 348 Minute and Order. Proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Rule 16(b) hearing and O/A heard on Defendants motion to stay discovery. Defendants motion 322 is granted in part, and denied in part. General discovery stayed, permitting limited period of expert discovery. Plaintiff shall file within 60 days their expert reports opposing Defendants motion to dismiss and within 2 months after Plaintiff files Plaintiffs expert reports both parties may depose the experts. Following close of expert depositions, Plaintiff shall have 2 months to file his opposition to Defendants motion to dismiss and for judgment on the pleadings. Defendants shall then have 30 days to file its reply. O/A at court's discretion. Court finds Plaintiff is in compliance with the 8/18/2011 order and the court directs Defendants to provide reciprocal discovery regarding the Harvard emails. Plaintiff also is directed, within 7 days, to provide argument why discovery is necessary for a Rule 12(c) motion. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (SDW) Modified on 4/6/2012 (SDW).
April 3, 2012 347 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 346 Reply to Response to Motion (Snyder, Orin)
April 3, 2012 346 REPLY to Response to Motion re 322 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Defer Setting a Discovery Schedule filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
April 1, 2012 345 RESPONSE in Opposition re 322 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Defer Setting a Discovery Schedule filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
March 30, 2012 344 DECLARATION signed by Paul Ceglia re 317 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
March 30, 2012 343 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 341 Declaration (Boland, Dean)
March 30, 2012 342 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 339 Declaration, 340 Declaration (Boland, Dean)
March 30, 2012 E-Filing Notification: No proof of service. Action required: File proof of service for 339 DECLARATION, 340 DECLARATION and 341 DECLARATION filed by (Boland, Dean). (DLC)
March 30, 2012 341 DECLARATION signed by Jason Holmberg re 317 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
March 29, 2012 340 DECLARATION signed by Dean Boland re 317 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
March 29, 2012 339 DECLARATION signed by Paul Ceglia re 317 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
March 29, 2012 338 TEXT ORDER re 299 Reply/Response filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. On 2/24/2012, Defendants filed their Supplemental Fee Application seeking fees reasonably expended in connection with Defendants' Fee Applicationgranted on 2/14/2012. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file his response to Defendants' Supplemental Fee Application by April 13, 2012. Entered by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/29/12. (TAH)
March 26, 2012 337 Featured Case ORDER re 322 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Defer Setting a Discovery Schedule filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 4/1/2012. Replies due by 4/3/2012. Oral Argument set for 4/4/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Defendants' request to file memorandum of law in excess of 25 pages is granted.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/26/2012. (SDW)
March 26, 2012 335 DECLARATION signed by Lisa T. Simpson re 318 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 334 DECLARATION signed by Amanda M. Aycock re 318 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 333 DECLARATION signed by Bryan J. Rose re 318 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 332 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. to 324 Declaration, Exhibits O - W to March 26, 2012 Southwell Declaration filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 331 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. to 324 Declaration, Exhibits G - N to March 26, 2012 Southwell Declaration filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 330 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. to 324 Declaration, Exhibit F to March 26, 2012 Southwell Declaration filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 329 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. to 324 Declaration, Exhibit E to March 26, 2012 Southwell Declaration filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 328 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. to 324 Declaration, Exhibit D to March 26, 2012 Southwell Declaration filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 327 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. to 324 Declaration, Exhibit C to March 26, 2012 Southwell Declaration filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 326 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. to 324 Declaration, Exhibit B to March 26, 2012 Southwell Declaration filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 325 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. to 324 Declaration, Exhibit A to March 26, 2012 Southwell Declaration filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 324 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 318 MOTION to Dismiss, 322 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Defer Setting a Discovery Schedule, 320 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 323 MEMORANDUM in Support re 322 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Defer Setting a Discovery Schedule filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 322 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Defer Setting a Discovery Schedule by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 321 MEMORANDUM in Support re 320 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 320 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 319 MEMORANDUM in Support re 318 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
March 26, 2012 318 MOTION to Dismiss by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
March 22, 2012 317 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER re: Defendants' Fifth Motion to Compel 294 . Oral argument scheduled for 4/4/2012 is cancelled. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 3/22/2012. (SDW)
March 19, 2012 316 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 313 Reply to Response to Motion, 315 Declaration, 314 Declaration, (Snyder, Orin)
March 19, 2012 315 DECLARATION signed by Bryan J. Rose re 313 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
March 19, 2012 313 REPLY to Response to Motion re 294 Fifth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
March 12, 2012 312 DECLARATION signed by Edward Flaitz re 310 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
March 12, 2012 311 DECLARATION signed by Paul Argentieri re 310 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
March 12, 2012 310 RESPONSE in Opposition re 294 Fifth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Boland, Dean)
March 5, 2012 309 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K. Skivington on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Skivington, Peter)
March 5, 2012 308 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Calihan on behalf of Paul D. Ceglia (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Calihan, Robert)
March 5, 2012 307 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ryan Clark on behalf of Paul D. Ceglia (Clark, Melissa)
March 5, 2012 306 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Young on behalf of Paul D. Ceglia (Young, Jennifer)
March 5, 2012 305 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanford P. Dumain on behalf of Paul D. Ceglia (Dumain, Sanford)
February 28, 2012 304 TEXT ORDER re 294 Fifth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 3/12/2012. Replies due by 3/19/2012. Oral Argument set for 4/4/2012 12:30 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/28/2012. (SDW)
February 28, 2012 303 TEXT ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2012 12:30 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio; adjourned from 3/28/2012. Proposed case management orders due 3/28/2012. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/28/2012. (SDW)
February 27, 2012 302 Featured Case ORDER directing Google, Inc. to provide the data and content to the Gmail Accounts pursuant to Plaintiff's consent. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/27/2012. (SDW)
February 24, 2012 301 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 299 Reply/Response, 300 Declaration (Snyder, Orin)
February 24, 2012 300 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 299 Reply/Response filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
February 24, 2012 299 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 292 Decision and Order,, in Support of Supplemental Fee Application filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
February 23, 2012 298 TEXT ORDER re 294 Fifth Motion to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 3/5/2012. Replies due by 3/12/2012. Oral Argument set for 3/28/2012 10:30 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Defendants' motion seeking authorization to serve subpoenas and orders upon webmail providers as described at Doc. No. 295, pp. 8-9 is, with Plaintiff's consent, GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/23/2012. (SDW)
February 21, 2012 297 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 294 Fifth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief, 296 Declaration, 295 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Snyder, Orin)
February 21, 2012 296 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 294 Fifth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Snyder, Orin)
February 21, 2012 295 MEMORANDUM in Support re 294 Fifth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
February 21, 2012 294 Fifth MOTION to Compel and For Other Relief by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
February 15, 2012 293 Featured Case ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2012 10:30 AM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/15/2012. (SDW)
February 14, 2012 292 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER. In accordance with the January 10, 2012 Decision and Order (Doc. No. 283), Defendants' Fee Application is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Defendants are awarded in connection with their Accelerated Motion to Compel $75, 776.70 in attorney's fees. Defendants are further ORDERED to file within ten (10) days, affidavits of attorney's fees and costs incurred preparing and defending the Fee Application. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 2/14/2012. (SDW)
February 1, 2012 291 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 290 Declaration, 289 Reply/Response (Snyder, Orin)
February 1, 2012 290 DECLARATION re 289 Reply/Response filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. Supplemental Declaration of Alexander H. Southwell filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
February 1, 2012 289 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 285 Memorandum/Brief in Support of Fee Application filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
January 30, 2012 288 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 285 Memorandum/Brief Regarding Application by Defendants for Attorney's Fees filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
January 23, 2012 Sanctions Paid: for $5,000 to this court as a civil contempt sanction, as well as the expenses, including attorney's fees, Defendants have incurred in attempting to obtain Plaintiff's email account information as directed by paragraph 5 of the August 18, 2011 Order. $5000.00 receipt number 027718. (DLC)
January 20, 2012 287 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 286 Declaration, 285 Memorandum/Brief (Snyder, Orin)
January 20, 2012 286 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 285 Memorandum/Brief filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Snyder, Orin)
January 20, 2012 285 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re 283 Decision and Order,,, in Support of Fee Application by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
January 10, 2012 284 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER. Based on this court's review of the record, Plaintiff has failed to demonstrate Defendants are guilty of any wrongdoing warranting sanctions with regard to the five computers. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for sanctions (Doc. No. 231), is DENIED.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 1/1/2012. (SDW)
January 10, 2012 283 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER. Defendants' request for sanctions is GRANTED; Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay $ 5,000 to this court as a civil contempt sanction, as well as the expenses, including attorney's fees, Defendants have incurred in attempting to obtain Plaintiff's email account information as directed by paragraph 5 of the August 18, 2011 Order. Plaintiff's payment of the $5,000 sanction by certified check to the Clerk of Court, Western District of New York, shall be made within twenty (20) days of this Decision and Order. Defendants are directed to file their affidavits of costs and attorneys' fees incurred, consistent with this Decision and Order, within ten (10) days of this Decision and Order; Plaintiff's opposition, if any, shall be filed within ten (10) days thereafter. Oral argument shall be at the discretion of the court.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 1/10/2012. (SDW)
January 4, 2012 E-Filing Notification: For future reference (document must include attorney full signature block i.e. name, address, telephone number and email address) no action required re 282 REPLY to Response to Motion re 231 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of Motion MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (filed by Boland, Dean) (DLC)
January 3, 2012 282 REPLY to Response to Motion re 231 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of Motion MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
January 3, 2012 E-Filing Notification: Document missing attorneys electronic signature. Action required: re-file document with proper signature and new proof of service. Re 279 REPLY to Response to Motion (Boland, Dean) (DLC)
December 30, 2011 281 DECLARATION signed by Dean Boland re 279 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
December 30, 2011 280 DECLARATION signed by Paul Argentieri re 279 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
December 30, 2011 279 REPLY to Response to Motion re 231 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of Motion MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
December 21, 2011 278 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 276 Response in Opposition to Motion, 277 Declaration (Snyder, Orin)
December 21, 2011 277 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 276 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
December 21, 2011 276 RESPONSE in Opposition re 231 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of Motion MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
December 21, 2011 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use (Notice Other) event. No action required re 274 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF. by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean) (DLC)
December 20, 2011 275 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re 272 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,,,,, 274 Memorandum/Brief by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
December 20, 2011 274 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re 272 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Brief by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
December 16, 2011 273 Featured Case ORDER directing Google to comply with this Court's November 3, 2011 order. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/16/2011. (SDW)
December 16, 2011 272 Featured Case ORDER withdrawing 188 Motion for Sanctions; withdrawing 198 Motion for Sanctions; denying 213 Motion for Sanctions; denying 216 Motion to Strike ; denying 223 Motion ; denying 228 Motion ; denying 243 Motion to Compel; terminating 243 Motion to Expedite; denying 267 Motion to Strike. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/16/2011. (SDW)
December 13, 2011 271 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Oral Argument held on 12/13/2011 on Plaintiff's motions for sanctions for spoliation of evidence 198 ; of emails 198 ; of the contract 213 ; Plaintiff's motions for prohibition of evidence [223 and 228] and Defendants' motions to strike and to compel. Parties directed to prepare an order with the court's ruling and submit to the court for approval and signature by 12/15/2011. Appearances: Pltf-Dean Boland, Esq.; Dfts-Orin Snyder, Esq., Amanda Aycock, Esq. and Terrence Flynn, Esq. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (SDW)
December 13, 2011 270 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 269 Reply to Response to Motion (Snyder, Orin)
December 12, 2011 269 REPLY to Response to Motion re 243 Fourth MOTION to Compel MOTION to Expedite Hearing filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
December 12, 2011 268 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 267 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion, 266 Memorandum/Brief Doc. No. 266 byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
December 12, 2011 267 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
December 12, 2011 266 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Concerning the December 13 Hearing by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
December 8, 2011 265 RESPONSE in Opposition re 243 Fourth MOTION to Compel MOTION to Expedite Hearing filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
December 8, 2011 264 DECLARATION signed by Paul Argentieri re 263 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
December 8, 2011 263 REPLY to Response to Motion re 189 MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation by Defendants, 188 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Defendants filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Boland, Dean)
December 8, 2011 262 REPLY to Response to Motion re 228 MOTION Order Prohibiting Defendants' Reliance on Inadmissible Evidence in Any Dispositive Motion NOTICE OF MOTION for Order Prohibiting Defendants Reliance on Inadmissible Evidence in Any Dispositive Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit A)(Boland, Dean)
December 8, 2011 261 REPLY to Response to Motion re 201 MOTION to Vacate 83 Order granting Defendants one-side expedited discovery filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
December 8, 2011 260 REPLY to Response to Motion re 223 MOTION Order re 41 Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Notice of Motion for Order Prohibiting Defendants from Reliance on Argument that Ceglia Zuckerberg email exchanges in Amended Complaint are Frauds in any dispositive motion MOTION Order re 41 Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Notice of Motion for Order Prohibiting Defendants from Reliance on Argument that Ceglia Zuckerberg email exchanges in Amended Complaint are Frauds in any dispositive motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
December 8, 2011 259 DECLARATION signed by Jerry Grant re 258 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
December 8, 2011 258 REPLY to Response to Motion re 198 MOTION for Sanctions NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EMAIL BY DEFENDANT ZUCKERBERG filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
December 8, 2011 257 DECLARATION signed by Paul Argentieri re 256 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
December 8, 2011 256 REPLY to Response to Motion re 213 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Facebook Contract by Defendants Regarding ungloved handling of Facebook Contract filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit A)(Boland, Dean)
December 8, 2011 255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 253 Reply to Response to Motion, 254 Declaration (Snyder, Orin)
December 8, 2011 254 DECLARATION signed by Robert Gianadda re 253 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
December 8, 2011 253 REPLY to Response to Motion re 216 MOTION to Strike 212 Declaration and for Sanctions filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
December 5, 2011 252 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 3, 2011, before Judge Leslie G. Foschio. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen J. Bush, Telephone number 585-613-4312. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/27/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2012. (DLC)
December 2, 2011 251 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' request for expedited hearing re 243 Fourth MOTION to Compel filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 12/8/2011. Replies due by 12/12/2011. Oral Argument set for 12/13/2011 12:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio.SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/2/2011. (SDW)
December 1, 2011 250 TEXT ORDER denying 231 Motion for TRO and Sanctions without prejudice in light of ongoing proceedings before Magistrate Judge Foschio. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 12/1/2011. (GAI)
December 1, 2011 249 TEXT ORDER re 231 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Responses due by 12/21/2011. Replies due by 12/30/2011. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 12/1/2011. (SDW)
December 1, 2011 248 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 247 Declaration, 245 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 243 Fourth MOTION to Compel MOTION to Expedite Hearing (Snyder, Orin)
December 1, 2011 247 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 243 Fourth MOTION to Compel MOTION to Expedite Hearing filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Orin)
December 1, 2011 246 Letter from Dean Boland, Esq., dated 11/30/2011, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio re: Plaintiff's motion filed 11/25/2011 231 . (SDW)
December 1, 2011 245 MEMORANDUM in Support re 243 Fourth MOTION to Compel MOTION to Expedite Hearing filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
December 1, 2011 244 Letter from Orin Snyder, Esq., dated 11/30/2011, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio re: Plaintiff's motion filed 11/25/2011 231 . (SDW)
December 1, 2011 243 Fourth MOTION to Compel, MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Expedited Hearing and Setting Response Deadlines)(Snyder, Orin)
November 28, 2011 242 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 237 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, 239 Declaration, 240 Declaration, 238 Declaration, 241 Declaration, (Snyder, Orin)
November 28, 2011 241 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 237 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Orin)
November 28, 2011 240 DECLARATION signed by Gerald M. LaPorte re 237 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
November 28, 2011 239 DECLARATION signed by Gus R. Lesnevich re 237 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Orin)
November 28, 2011 238 DECLARATION signed by Peter V. Tytell re 237 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Snyder, Orin)
November 28, 2011 237 RESPONSE in Opposition re 201 MOTION to Vacate 83 Order granting Defendants one-side expedited discovery, 188 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Defendants, 228 MOTION Order Prohibiting Defendants' Reliance on Inadmissible Evidence in Any Dispositive Motion NOTICE OF MOTION for Order Prohibiting Defendants Reliance on Inadmissible Evidence in Any Dispositive Motion, 213 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Facebook Contract by Defendants, 198 MOTION for Sanctions NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EMAIL BY DEFENDANT ZUCKERBERG, 223 MOTION Order re 41 Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Notice of Motion for Order Prohibiting Defendants from Reliance on Argument that Ceglia Zuckerberg email exchanges in Amended Complaint are Frauds in any dispositive motion MOTION Order re 41 Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Notice of Motion for Order Prohibiting Defendants from Reliance on Argument that Ceglia Zuckerberg email exchanges in Amended Complaint are Frauds in any dispositive motion filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
November 28, 2011 236 DECLARATION signed by Dean Boland re 235 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
November 28, 2011 235 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 216 MOTION to Strike 212 Declaration and for Sanctions filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
November 28, 2011 234 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Telephone Conference held on 11/28/2011. Court defers setting scheduling order on Plaintiff's TRO/sanctions motion pending receipt of letter from Defendants by close of business 11/30/2011. Appearances: Pltf-Dean Boland, Esq.; Dfts-Orin Snyder, Esq., Alex Southwell, ESq. (SDW)
November 25, 2011 233 DECLARATION signed by Dean Boland re 232 Memorandum in Support, 231 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of Motion MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
November 25, 2011 232 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 231 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of Motion MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(Boland, Dean)
November 25, 2011 231 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of Motion, MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
November 24, 2011 230 DECLARATION signed by Paul Ceglia re 229 Memorandum in Support, 228 MOTION Order Prohibiting Defendants' Reliance on Inadmissible Evidence in Any Dispositive Motion NOTICE OF MOTION for Order Prohibiting Defendants Reliance on Inadmissible Evidence in Any Dispositive Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
November 24, 2011 229 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 228 MOTION Order Prohibiting Defendants' Reliance on Inadmissible Evidence in Any Dispositive Motion NOTICE OF MOTION for Order Prohibiting Defendants Reliance on Inadmissible Evidence in Any Dispositive Motion byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Boland, Dean)
November 24, 2011 228 MOTION Order Prohibiting Defendants' Reliance on Inadmissible Evidence in Any Dispositive Motion NOTICE OF MOTION for Order Prohibiting Defendants Reliance on Inadmissible Evidence in Any Dispositive Motion by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
November 23, 2011 227 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Telephone Conference held on 11/23/2011 w/ Plaintiff's counsel Dean Boland, Esq. and Defendants' counsel Orin Snyder, Esq. and Alex Southwell, Esq. The court discussed Plaintiff's intended motion for a temporary restraining order. (SDW)
November 17, 2011 226 DECLARATION signed by Jerry Grant re 223 MOTION Order re 41 Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Notice of Motion for Order Prohibiting Defendants from Reliance on Argument that Ceglia Zuckerberg email exchanges in Amended Complaint are Frauds in any dispositive motion MOTION Order re 41 Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Notice of Motion for Order Prohibiting Defendants from Reliance on Argument that Ceglia Zuckerberg email exchanges in Amended Complaint are Frauds in any dispositive motion, 224 Memorandum in Support,, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
November 17, 2011 225 DECLARATION signed by Paul Ceglia re 223 MOTION Order re 41 Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Notice of Motion for Order Prohibiting Defendants from Reliance on Argument that Ceglia Zuckerberg email exchanges in Amended Complaint are Frauds in any dispositive motion MOTION Order re 41 Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Notice of Motion for Order Prohibiting Defendants from Reliance on Argument that Ceglia Zuckerberg email exchanges in Amended Complaint are Frauds in any dispositive motion, 224 Memorandum in Support,, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
November 17, 2011 224 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 223 MOTION Order re 41 Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Notice of Motion for Order Prohibiting Defendants from Reliance on Argument that Ceglia Zuckerberg email exchanges in Amended Complaint are Frauds in any dispositive motion MOTION Order re 41 Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Notice of Motion for Order Prohibiting Defendants from Reliance on Argument that Ceglia Zuckerberg email exchanges in Amended Complaint are Frauds in any dispositive motion byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
November 17, 2011 223 MOTION Order re 41 Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Notice of Motion for Order Prohibiting Defendants from Reliance on Argument that Ceglia Zuckerberg email exchanges in Amended Complaint are Frauds in any dispositive motion filed during or at the end of Expedited Discovery by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
November 17, 2011 222 TEXT ORDER re 216 MOTION to Strike 212 Declaration and for Sanctions filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, 213 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Facebook Contract by Defendants filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Responses due by 11/28/2011. Replies due by 12/8/2011. Oral Argument set for 12/13/2011 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202 before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/17/2011. (SDW)
November 15, 2011 221 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 216 MOTION to Strike 212 Declaration and for Sanctions (Snyder, Orin)
November 15, 2011 220 DECLARATION signed by Terrance P. Flynn re 216 MOTION to Strike 212 Declaration and for Sanctions filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
November 15, 2011 219 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 216 MOTION to Strike 212 Declaration and for Sanctions filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
November 15, 2011 218 DECLARATION signed by Robert Gianadda re 216 MOTION to Strike 212 Declaration and for Sanctions filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
November 15, 2011 217 MEMORANDUM in Support re 216 MOTION to Strike 212 Declaration and for Sanctions filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
November 15, 2011 216 MOTION to Strike 212 Declaration and for Sanctions by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
November 11, 2011 215 DECLARATION signed by Thomas Martin re 214 Memorandum in Support, 213 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Facebook Contract by Defendants filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
November 11, 2011 214 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 213 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Facebook Contract by Defendants byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
November 11, 2011 213 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Facebook Contract by Defendants by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
November 11, 2011 212 DECLARATION signed by Robert Gianadda re 188 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Defendants filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
November 8, 2011 211 TEXT ORDER re 188 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Defendants filed by Paul D. Ceglia, 198 MOTION for Sanctions NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EMAIL BY DEFENDANT ZUCKERBERG filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Responses due by 11/28/2011. Replies due by 12/8/2011. Oral Argument set for 12/13/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/8/2011. (SDW)
November 3, 2011 210 DECLARATION signed by James Blanco re 188 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Defendants filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
November 3, 2011 209 DECLARATION signed by Larry Stewart re 188 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Defendants filed by Paul D. Ceglia Corrected Declaration. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boland, Dean)
November 3, 2011 208 Featured Case ORDER granting 154 Motion to Compel. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 11/3/2011. (SDW)
November 2, 2011 207 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Oral Argument held on 11/2/2011 re: Defendants' motion to compel 154 . Parties directed to prepare an order for the court's signature by 11/3/2011 noon. Appearances: Pltf-Paul Argentieri, Esq., Dean Boland, Esq.; Dfts-Orin Snyder, Esq., Amanda Aycock, Esq., Terrence Flynn, Esq. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (SDW)
November 2, 2011 206 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re E-Filing Notification Wrong Document Attached, Correct PDF attached byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Corrected Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Vacate Doc. No. 83)(Boland, Dean)
November 2, 2011 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect.pdf file attached to entry. Action required: re-file entry with correct attachment and new proof of service Re 201 MOTION to Vacate 83 Order granting Defendants one-side expedited discovery. Motion terminated. (DLC)
November 2, 2011 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use (Continuance of Exhibits) event. No action required. Document re-titled and motion terminated Re 191 MOTION for Sanctions EXHIBIT B TO MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION BY DEFENDANTS. (DLC)
November 2, 2011 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use (Continuance of Exhibits) event. No action required. Document re-titled and motion terminated Re 190 MOTION for Sanctions EXHIBIT A TO MEMORANDUM OF LAW - MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION BY DEFENDANTS. (DLC)
November 2, 2011 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use (Memorandum/Brief or Memorandum in support) event. No action required. Title of document changed on docket and motion terminated Re 189 MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation by Defendants. (DLC)
November 2, 2011 205 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 189 MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation by Defendants regarding Corrected Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, Doc. No. 189 (Boland, Dean)
November 2, 2011 204 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Paul D. Ceglia. to 190 MOTION for Sanctions EXHIBIT A TO MEMORANDUM OF LAW - MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION BY DEFENDANTS, 189 MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation by Defendants Corrected Exhibit A to Memorandum filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 203 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 201 MOTION to Vacate 83 Order granting Defendants one-side expedited discovery, 202 Memorandum in Support (Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 202 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 201 MOTION to Vacate 83 Order granting Defendants one-side expedited discovery, 83 Order byPaul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 201 MOTION to Vacate 83 Order granting Defendants one-side expedited discovery by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 199 Memorandum in Support,, 198 MOTION for Sanctions NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EMAIL BY DEFENDANT ZUCKERBERG (Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 199 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 198 MOTION for Sanctions NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EMAIL BY DEFENDANT ZUCKERBERG byPaul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - LITIGATION HOLD LETTER, # 2 Exhibit B - TRANSCRIPT OF TESTIMONY OF MARK ZUCKERBERG, JUNE 22, 2006, # 3 Exhibit C - DEPOSITION OF ALAN GREENSPAN, # 4 Exhibit D - FTC COMPLAINT OF UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES AGAINST DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, # 5 Exhibit E - BRIEF DETAILING PATENT INFRINGEMENT FINDING AGAINST FACEBOOK)(Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 198 MOTION for Sanctions NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION OF EMAIL BY DEFENDANT ZUCKERBERG by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 197 DECLARATION signed by Larry Stewart re 192 Declaration, 196 Certificate of Service,, 189 MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation by Defendants filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 2, # 3 Exhibit Attachment 3)(Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 196 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 192 Declaration, 193 Declaration, 194 Declaration, 191 MOTION for Sanctions EXHIBIT B TO MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION BY DEFENDANTS, 195 Declaration, 188 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Defendants, 190 MOTION for Sanctions EXHIBIT A TO MEMORANDUM OF LAW - MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION BY DEFENDANTS, 189 MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation by Defendants (Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 195 DECLARATION signed by Dean Boland re 189 MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation by Defendants filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 194 DECLARATION signed by James Blanco re 189 MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation by Defendants filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 193 DECLARATION signed by PAUL ARGENTIERI re 189 MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation by Defendants filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 192 DECLARATION re 189 MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation by Defendants filed by Paul D. Ceglia BY LARRY STEWART. (Boland, Dean)
November 1, 2011 191 EXHIBIT B TO MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION BY DEFENDANTS by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean) Modified on 11/2/2011 (DLC).
November 1, 2011 190 EXHIBIT A TO MEMORANDUM OF LAW - MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION BY DEFENDANTS by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean) Modified on 11/2/2011 (DLC).
November 1, 2011 189 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 188 Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation by Defendants by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean) Modified on 11/2/2011 (DLC).
November 1, 2011 188 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Defendants by Paul D. Ceglia.(Boland, Dean)
October 31, 2011 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 186 Declaration, 185 Reply to Response to Motion (Snyder, Orin)
October 31, 2011 186 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 185 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
October 31, 2011 185 REPLY to Response to Motion re 154 Third MOTION to Compel and for Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
October 27, 2011 184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 180 Amended Document, 177 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 179 Declaration, 178 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Boland, Dean)
October 27, 2011 183 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 176 Response in Opposition to Motion (Boland, Dean)
October 27, 2011 E-Filing Notification: No proof of service. Action required: File proof of service re 180 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Paul D. Ceglia. Amendment to 179 Declaration - Corrected Exhibit B. (Boland, Dean) (DLC)
October 27, 2011 182 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 181 Reply/Response in Opposition to Ceglia's Memorandum Regarding Authority for Privilege Claims as to Two Documents (Snyder, Orin)
October 27, 2011 181 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 177 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion in Opposition to Ceglia's Memorandum Regarding Authority for Privilege Claims as to Two Documents filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
October 26, 2011 180 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Paul D. Ceglia. Amendment to 179 Declaration - Corrected Exhibit B. (Boland, Dean)
October 26, 2011 179 DECLARATION signed by Dean Boland re 176 Response in Opposition to Motion, 177 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 178 Affidavit in Support of Motion filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Boland, Dean)
October 26, 2011 178 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 154 Third MOTION to Compel and for Other Relief clarifying to court portions of document for which privilege is claimed filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
October 26, 2011 177 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 154 Third MOTION to Compel and for Other Relief regarding assertion of privilege filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Boland, Dean)
October 24, 2011 176 RESPONSE in Opposition re 154 Third MOTION to Compel and for Other Relief filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Boland, Dean)
October 24, 2011 175 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER denying 164 Motion to Stay. As an accommodation to Plaintiff, the court sua sponte extends the response date to 10/25/2011, 5:00 p.m. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed not later than O10/31/2011. Oral argument remains as originally scheduled for 11/2/2011 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/24/2011. (SDW)
October 21, 2011 174 NOTICE by Paul D. Ceglia of Substitution of Counsel (Lake, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2011 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean M. Boland on behalf of Paul D. Ceglia (Boland, Dean)
October 21, 2011 172 Featured Case ORDER. Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal (Doc. No. 168) on behalf of Jeffrey A. Lake, Esq., is struck without prejudice.. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/21/2011. (SDW)
October 20, 2011 171 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 170 Response in Opposition to Motion (Snyder, Orin)
October 20, 2011 170 RESPONSE in Opposition re 164 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Temporarily filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
October 20, 2011 169 Featured Case ORDER. Plaintiff shall show cause why the purposed Notice of Withdraw by stipulation filed October 19, 2011 (Doc. No. 168) should not be struck as non-compliant with this court's Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.2(d)(2). Plaintiff's papers in response to this order shall be filed by 4:00 p.m., October 20, 2011. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/20/2011. (SDW)
October 19, 2011 168 NOTICE by Paul D. Ceglia of Withdrawal of Counsel (Lake, Jeffrey)
October 18, 2011 167 TEXT ORDER. In connection with Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion 154 due 10/24/2011, Plaintiff is directed to submit to the court under seal, for the court's in camera review, copies of each document Plaintiff asserts is subject to the attorney-client privilege as described in Plaintiff's privilege log. Plaintiff may submit such copies directly to chambers. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/18/2011. (SDW)
October 18, 2011 166 TEXT ORDER. By papers filed 10/17/2011, 164 , Plaintiff moves for a stay of proceedings to facilitate a withdrawal of Plaintiff's present attorney, Jeffrey A. Lake, Esq., and the appearance of new counsel. Defendants' Responses due by 10/20/2011. Plaintiff's Reply, if any, due by 10/21/2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/18/2011. (SDW)
October 17, 2011 165 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 164 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Temporarily (Lake, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2011 164 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Temporarily by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A)(Lake, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2011 163 Featured Case ORDER re 154 Third MOTION to Compel and for Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 10/24/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. Oral Argument set for 11/2/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 10/17/2011. (SDW)
October 14, 2011 162 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 161 Reply/Response (Snyder, Orin)
October 14, 2011 161 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 153 Reply/Response, 152 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
October 14, 2011 160 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 153 Reply/Response (Lake, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2011 159 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 158 Declaration, 157 Declaration, 156 Declaration, 154 Third MOTION to Compel and for Other Relief, 155 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Snyder, Orin)
October 14, 2011 158 DECLARATION signed by Gerald M. LaPorte re 154 Third MOTION to Compel and for Other Relief filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
October 14, 2011 157 DECLARATION signed by Michael F. McGowan re 154 Third MOTION to Compel and for Other Relief filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
October 14, 2011 156 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 154 Third MOTION to Compel and for Other Relief filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Snyder, Orin)
October 14, 2011 155 MEMORANDUM in Support re 154 Third MOTION to Compel and for Other Relief filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
October 14, 2011 154 Third MOTION to Compel and for Other Relief by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
October 11, 2011 E-Filing Notification: No proof of service. Action required: File proof of service re 153 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 152 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Lake, Jeffrey) (DLC)
October 7, 2011 153 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 152 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Lake, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2011 152 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER granting Defendants' 128 Motion to Compel. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/28/2011. (SDW)
September 27, 2011 151 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 150 Declaration, 149 Reply to Response to Motion (Snyder, Orin)
September 27, 2011 150 DECLARATION signed by Amanda M. Aycock re 149 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
September 27, 2011 149 REPLY to Response to Motion re 128 MOTION to Compel filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 26, 2011 148 RESPONSE in Opposition re 128 MOTION to Compel filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Lake, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2011 147 TEXT ORDER re 128 MOTION to Compel filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/26/2011. Replies due by 9/30/2011. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/20/2011. (SDW)
September 20, 2011 146 TEXT ORDER denying 134 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as moot based on Hon. Richard J. Arcara's affirmance of this court's Decision and Order. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/20/2011. (SDW)
September 16, 2011 145 Featured Case ORDER affirming the Decision and Order and referring case back to Magistrate Jduge Foschio for further proceedings. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 9/16/2011. (JMB)
September 12, 2011 144 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 143 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Snyder, Orin)
September 12, 2011 143 RESPONSE in Opposition re 131 MOTION for Discovery Objections to Magistrate Judge Foschio's August 18, 2011 Order -- Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Judge Foschio's August 18, 2011 Order filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 12, 2011 142 TEXT ORDER. The court's order filed 9/9/2011 (Doc. No. 141) is VACATED. Defendants' response to 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply due by 9/14/2011. Plaintiff's reply due by 9/16/2011. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/12/2011. (SDW)
September 9, 2011 141 THIS ORDER HAS BEEN VACATED, see Text Order 142 ...TEXT ORDER re 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 128 MOTION to Compel filed by Paul D. Ceglia, 128 MOTION to Compel filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/14/2011. Replies due by 9/16/2011. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 9/9/2011. (SDW) Modified on 9/13/2011 (DLC).
September 6, 2011 140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 138 Declaration, 139 Declaration, 137 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Snyder, Orin)
September 6, 2011 139 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 137 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit C)(Snyder, Orin)
September 6, 2011 138 DECLARATION signed by Terrance P. Flynn re 137 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
September 6, 2011 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 128 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 128 MOTION to Compel filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 6, 2011 136 TEXT ORDER RE: 131 Objections. Defendants shall file any responding papers on or before 9/12/2011, after which the matter will be deemed submitted on papers pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). SO ORDERED.Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 9/6/2011. (JMB)
September 2, 2011 135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 128 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 128 MOTION to Compel (Lake, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2011 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 128 MOTION to Compel by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of Jeffrey A. Lake, # 3 Affidavit of Paul A. Argentieri, # 4 Affidavit of Nathan A. Shaman, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C)(Lake, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2011 133 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 131 MOTION for Discovery Objections to Magistrate Judge Foschio's August 18, 2011 Order filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lake, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2011 132 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 128 MOTION to Compel (Snyder, Orin)
September 1, 2011 131 MOTION for Discovery Objections to Magistrate Judge Foschio's August 18, 2011 Order by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lake, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2011 129 MEMORANDUM in Support re 128 MOTION to Compel filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
September 1, 2011 128 MOTION to Compel by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
August 30, 2011 127 TEXT ORDER denying 126 Motion to Stay. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 8/30/2011. (JMB)
August 29, 2011 126 MOTION to Stay re 117 Order, Terminate Motions by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Lake, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2011 125 Featured Case DECISION and ORDER denying 118 Motion to Stay. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 8/26/2011. (JMB)
August 24, 2011 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 123 Response in Opposition to Motion (Snyder, Orin)
August 24, 2011 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re 118 MOTION to Stay re 117 Order, Terminate Motions filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
August 23, 2011 122 TEXT ORDER RE: 118 Motion to Stay. Defendants shall file any responding papers on or before August 24, 2011, after which the motion will be deemed submitted on papers pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). SO ORDERED.Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 8/23/2011. (JMB)
August 22, 2011 121 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 17, 2011, before Judge Leslie G.Foscio. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jolene Lamphier, Telephone number 716-853-5600. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2011. (DLC)
August 22, 2011 120 MEMORANDUM in Support re 118 MOTION to Stay re 117 Order, Terminate Motions filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Lake, Jeffrey)
August 22, 2011 119 TEXT ORDER RE: 118 Motion to Stay. The desire to file objections to a magistrate judge's order does not, by itself, warrant a stay of that order. See Am. Rock Salt Co., LLC v. Norfolk S. Corp., 371 F. Supp. 2d 358, 360-61 (W.D.N.Y. 2005). Accordingly, plaintiff is directed to file supplemental briefing setting forth the basis for a stay. See Fed. R. Civ. 26(c); Ellington Credit Fund, Ltd. v. Select Portfolio Servs., Inc., No. 08 Civ. 2437, 2009 WL 274483 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 3, 2009). Magistrate Judge Foschio's Order of 8/18/2011 (Dkt. No. 117) remains in full force at this time. SO ORDERED.. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 8/22/2011. (JMB)
August 19, 2011 118 MOTION to Stay re 117 Order, Terminate Motions by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Lake, Jeffrey)
August 18, 2011 117 Featured Case ORDER re 95 Cross MOTION to Compel filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, 91 MOTION to Compel filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/18/2011. (SDW)
August 18, 2011 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Pretrial Conference held on 8/18/2011 regarding order prepared by parties for court's signature. Plaintiff's oral request for stay was denied. Appearances: Pltf-Jeffrey Lake, Esq., Dft-Alex Southwell, Esq., Amanda Aycock, Esq., Terrence Flynn, Esq. (SDW)
August 17, 2011 115 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Oral Argument held on 8/17/2011 regarding Plaintiff's motion to compel 91 and Defendants' cross-motion to compel 95 . Parties directed to prepare an order with Court's decisions and report back 8/18/2011 at 10:00 a.m. Appearances: Pltf-Jeffrey Lake, Esq., Paul Argentieri, Esq., Dft-Orin Snyder, Esq., Amanda Aycock, Esq., Terrence Flynn, Esq. (Court Reporter Jolene Lamphier, Jack Hunt & Associates.) (SDW)
August 16, 2011 114 TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to Plaintiff's letter motion filed 8/15/2011 (Doc. No. 108), the court's Decision and Order filed 8/12/2011 (Doc. No. 107) regarding Plaintiff's production of Items 1 - 4 is stayed pending oral argument scheduled for 8/17/2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/16/2011. (SDW)
August 16, 2011 E-Filing Notification: Letters should not be filed without Court permission. Re 108 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Lake, Jeffrey) (DLC)
August 15, 2011 113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 110 Reply to Response to Motion, 112 Declaration, 111 Declaration (Snyder, Orin)
August 15, 2011 112 DECLARATION signed by Dr. Albert Lyter III re 110 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit C)(Snyder, Orin)
August 15, 2011 111 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 110 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
August 15, 2011 110 REPLY to Response to Motion re 95 Cross MOTION to Compel filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
August 15, 2011 109 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 108 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion and re 107 DECISION AND ORDER (Lake, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2011 108 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 95 Cross MOTION to Compel and re 107 DECISION AND ORDER filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Lake, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2011 107 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER. Defendants' cross-motion (Doc. No. 95) to reject Plaintiff's assertion of attorney-client privilege in Items 104 and to de-designate the 120 items listed by Plaintiff in the Privilege Log as confidential under the Order is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. Plaintiff shall produce Items 1-4 to Defendants by 10:00 a.m., August 17, 2011. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/12/2011. (SDW)
August 10, 2011 106 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 95 Cross MOTION to Compel, 91 MOTION to Compel Defendant Zuckerberg's Compliance with the Court's Order of July 1, 2011 filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Affidavit, # 15 Exhibit A, # 16 Exhibit B, # 17 Exhibit C, # 18 Certificate of Service)(Lake, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2011 105 TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff shall produce by 4:00 p.m. EST, Thursday, August 11, 2011, for the court's in camera inspection: (1) complete copies of items 1-46 listed on Plaintiff's privilege log denominated as confidential; (2) complete copies of all documents which Plaintiff asserts the attorney-client privilege. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/10/2011. (SDW)
August 8, 2011 104 TEXT ORDER granting 101 Motion for Leave to Substitute Redacted Document. Clerk of Court is directed to use Exhibit A to Doc. No. 102 as the Redacted Notice of Cross-Motion to Compel in substitution of Doc. No. 95. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/8/2011. (SDW)
August 5, 2011 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 101 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Substitute Redacted Document (Southwell, Alexander)
August 5, 2011 102 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 101 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Substitute Redacted Document filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Southwell, Alexander)
August 5, 2011 101 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Substitute Redacted Document by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Southwell, Alexander)
August 5, 2011 100 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 95 Cross MOTION to Compel, 97 Declaration,, 98 Declaration, 99 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 96 Declaration, (Snyder, Orin)
August 4, 2011 99 MEMORANDUM in Support re 95 Cross MOTION to Compel, 91 MOTION to Compel Defendant Zuckerberg's Compliance with the Court's Order of July 1, 2011 Defendants' Redacted Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Cross-Motion to Compel and For Other Relief, and In Opposition to Ceglia's Motion to Compel filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
August 4, 2011 98 DECLARATION signed by Dr. Albert Lyter III re 95 Cross MOTION to Compel, 91 MOTION to Compel Defendant Zuckerberg's Compliance with the Court's Order of July 1, 2011 filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
August 4, 2011 97 DECLARATION signed by Alexander H. Southwell re 95 Cross MOTION to Compel, 91 MOTION to Compel Defendant Zuckerberg's Compliance with the Court's Order of July 1, 2011 filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Southwell, Alexander)
August 4, 2011 96 DECLARATION signed by Terrance P. Flynn re 95 Cross MOTION to Compel, 91 MOTION to Compel Defendant Zuckerberg's Compliance with the Court's Order of July 1, 2011 filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
August 4, 2011 95 Cross MOTION to Compel by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2011: # 1 Redacted Notice of Cross Motion to Compel) (DLC).
August 4, 2011 94 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 30, 2011, before Judge Leslie G. Foschio. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2011. (DLC)
July 27, 2011 93 TEXT ORDER re 91 MOTION to Compel Defendant Zuckerberg's Compliance with the Court's Order of July 1, 2011 filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Defendants' Responses and Cross-motion due by 8/4/2011. Plaintiff's Response and Reply due by 8/9/2011. Defendants' Reply due 8/12/2011. Oral Argument set for 8/17/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. If necessary, to assist the court in its determination of Plaintiff's motion, an evidentiary hearing will be conducted on 8/18/2011 commencing at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/27/2011. (SDW)
July 26, 2011 92 TEXT ORDER re 91 MOTION to Compel Defendant Zuckerberg's Compliance with the Court's Order of July 1, 2011 filed by Paul D. Ceglia. Responses due by 8/4/2011. Replies due by 8/8/2011. Oral Argument set for 8/11/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. If necessary, to assist the court in its determination of Plaintiff's motion, an evidentiary hearing will be conducted on 8/12/2011 commencing at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/26/2011. (SDW)
July 25, 2011 91 MOTION to Compel Defendant Zuckerberg's Compliance with the Court's Order of July 1, 2011 by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Lake, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2011 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 88 Declaration (Lake, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2011 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul D. Ceglia re 87 Declaration (Lake, Jeffrey)
July 18, 2011 E-Filing Notification: No proof of service. Action required: File proof of service re 88 DECLARATION signed by Paul D. Ceglia (Lake, Jeffrey) (DLC)
July 15, 2011 88 DECLARATION signed by Paul D. Ceglia re 83 Order filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Lake, Jeffrey)
July 15, 2011 E-Filing Notification: No proof of service. Action required: File proof of service 87 DECLARATION signed by Jeffrey A. Lake re 83 Order filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Lake, Jeffrey) (DLC)
July 14, 2011 87 DECLARATION signed by Jeffrey A. Lake re 83 Order filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Lake, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2011 86 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/13/2011. (SDW)
July 1, 2011 85 Featured Case ORDER -- Electronic Asset Inspection Protocol. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/1/2011. (SDW)
July 1, 2011 84 Featured Case ORDER -- Hard-Copy Document Inspection Protocol. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/1/2011. (SDW)
July 1, 2011 83 Featured Case ORDER. Defendants' Motion for Expedited Discovery is GRANTED and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Mutual Expedited Discovery is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/1/2011. (SDW)
June 30, 2011 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio: Oral Argument held on 6/30/2011 re: Defendants motion to expedite discovery 44 and Plaintiffs cross-motion for discovery 57 . Motions granted in part as to both document and electronic discovery. Parties to provide an order and testing protocol to the court by 7/1/2011 by 10:00 a.m. Following discovery exchange and testing, the parties shall advise the court as to the testing results and contact the court to schedule a further Rule 16 hearing to schedule further proceedings. Appearances: Pltf-Jeffrey Lake, Esq.; Deft-Orin Snyder, Esq.; Matthew Benjamin, Esq., Terrance Flynn, Esq. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (SDW)
June 30, 2011 Remark - Attorney Jeffrey Alan Lake is admitted in this district and is not required to comply with Local Rule 83.1. (DLC)
June 30, 2011 81 TEXT ORDER. For the reasons stated in Defendants' opposition, Plaintiff's 79 Motion to Continue is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/30/2011. (SDW)
June 29, 2011 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 MOTION to Continue Hearing filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
June 29, 2011 79 MOTION to Continue Hearing by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey A. Lake in Support of Motion to Continue)(Lake, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2011 78 TEXT ORDER. By letter dated June 28, 2011 (Doc. No. 77) ("the letter"), Defendants request that the Rule 16(b) conference scheduled for June 30, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. be adjourned for the reasons stated in the letter. The request is DENIED. The parties shall appear as directed. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/29/2011. (SDW)
June 29, 2011 77 Letter from Orin Snyder, Esq., dated 6/28/2011, to Hon. Leslie G. Foschio (SDW)
June 29, 2011 76 TEXT ORDER granting 75 Motion to Substitute Attorney subject to Mr. Lake's compliance with Local Rule 83.1. Added attorney Jeffrey Alan Lake for Paul D. Ceglia. Attorneys Carrie S. Parikh; Dennis C. Vacco; Kevin James Cross and Christopher Patrick Hall terminated. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/29/2011. (SDW)
June 28, 2011 75 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher)
June 28, 2011 E-Filing Notification: 55 Docket Entry corrected to read "Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio." (SDW)
June 24, 2011 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 72 Reply to Response to Motion, 73 Declaration (Snyder, Orin)
June 24, 2011 73 DECLARATION signed by Bryan J. Rose re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
June 24, 2011 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery, 57 Cross MOTION for Discovery - Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for "Mutual" Expedited Discovery filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
June 20, 2011 71 TEXT ORDER. Defendants' response to 57 Cross MOTION for Discovery filed by Paul D. Ceglia due by 6/24/2011 and Plaintiff's Replies due by 6/28/2011. Oral Argument set for 6/30/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/20/2011. (SDW)
June 20, 2011 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document's. For future reference, use (Declaration) event. No action required re 66 Cross MOTION for Discovery. 61 Cross MOTION for Discovery, 65 Cross MOTION for Discovery, 62 Cross MOTION for Discovery, 59 Cross MOTION for Discovery, 63 Cross MOTION for Discovery, 60 Cross MOTION for Discovery, 64 Cross MOTION for Discovery (Proposed Order should be e-mailed directly to chambers) re 67 Cross MOTION for Discovery, no action required. (Certificate of Service) re 68 Cross MOTION for Discovery, no action required. (Memorandum in Opposition) re 58 Cross MOTION for Discovery, no action required. Documents terminated as motions and text re-titled on docket. (DLC)
June 17, 2011 70 Declaration(DLC) Modified on 6/20/2011 (JMM). (document unsealed pursuant to chambers)
June 17, 2011 69 Motion (DLC) Modified on 6/20/2011 (JMM). (unsealed pursuant to instructions from chambers
June 17, 2011 68 Certificate of Service by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2011 (DLC).
June 17, 2011 67 Proposed Order by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2011 (DLC).
June 17, 2011 66 Declaration of Valery N. Aginsky by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2011 (DLC).
June 17, 2011 65 Declaration of Paul D. Ceglia by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2011 (DLC).
June 17, 2011 64 Declaration of Paul Argentieri by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2011 (DLC).
June 17, 2011 63 Declaration of Michael Pliszka by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2011 (DLC).
June 17, 2011 62 Declaration of John Paul by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2011 (DLC).
June 17, 2011 61 Declaration of John H. Evans by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2011 (DLC).
June 17, 2011 60 Declaration of Christopher (Kip) P. Hall by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2011 (DLC).
June 17, 2011 59 Declaration of Carie S. Parikh by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2011 (DLC).
June 17, 2011 58 Memorandum of Law by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2011 (DLC).
June 17, 2011 57 Cross MOTION for Discovery by Paul D. Ceglia.(Hall, Christopher)
June 2, 2011 56 Featured Case ORDER re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. Responses due by 6/17/2011. Replies due by 6/24/2011. Oral Argument set for 6/30/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 6/2/2011. (SDW)
June 2, 2011 55 Featured Case ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 6/2/2011. (SDW)
June 2, 2011 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery, 46 Declaration, 52 Declaration, 53 Declaration, 50 Declaration, 45 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 47 Declaration, 49 Declaration, 51 Declaration, 48 Declaration, (Snyder, Orin)
June 2, 2011 53 DECLARATION signed by Albert H. Lyter re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Orin)
June 2, 2011 52 DECLARATION signed by Gus R. Lesnevich re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Snyder, Orin)
June 2, 2011 51 DECLARATION signed by Michael F. McGowan re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Orin)
June 2, 2011 50 DECLARATION signed by Gerald R. McMenamin re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Orin)
June 2, 2011 49 DECLARATION signed by Donald R. Henne re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Snyder, Orin)
June 2, 2011 48 DECLARATION signed by Frank J. Romano re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Orin)
June 2, 2011 47 DECLARATION signed by Bryan J. Rose re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Snyder, Orin)
June 2, 2011 46 DECLARATION signed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
June 2, 2011 45 MEMORANDUM in Support re 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin)
June 2, 2011 44 MOTION to Expedite - Notice of Motion for Expedited Discovery by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Orin)
May 27, 2011 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg re 40 Answer to Amended Complaint (Snyder, Orin)
May 27, 2011 42 ADR Notice and Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys.(DLC)
May 27, 2011 E-Filing Notification: No proof of service. Action required: File proof of service re 40 ANSWER to 39 Amended Complaint by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin) (DLC)
May 27, 2011 41 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Leslie G. Foschio The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED.. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 5/27/2011. (JMB)
May 26, 2011 40 ANSWER to 39 Amended Complaint by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg.(Snyder, Orin)
April 11, 2011 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Hall, Christopher)
April 11, 2011 38 NOTICE by Paul D. Ceglia OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL of Christopher P. (Kip) Hall, Esq, (kip.hall@dlapiper.com) and Carrie S. Parikh, Esq., (carrie.parikh@dlapiper.com) of DLA PIPER LLP (US), 125 1 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY 10020, (212) 335-4500, for and in place of Connors & Vilardo, LLP (Terrence M. Connors, Esq., Lawrence J. Vilardo, Esq., Randall D. White, Esq. and James W. Grable, Esq., of Counsel). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hall, Christopher)
March 30, 2011 37 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg of Withdrawal of Notice of Appearance (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Powers, Michael)
March 28, 2011 E-Filing Notification: Revised 36 DECISION AND ORDER denying 23 Motion to Remand to State Court. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 14 days of this Order or advise the Court of his intent not to do so. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 3/28/2011. (JMB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2011: # 1 Rev'd Decision and Order) (JMB). (JMB)
March 28, 2011 36 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER denying 23 Motion to Remand to State Court. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 14 days of this Order or advise the Court of his intent not to do so. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 3/28/2011. (JMB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2011: # 1 Rev'd Decision and Order) (JMB).
January 25, 2011 35 TEXT ORDER 4 Motion to Vacate was granted by Dkt. No. 16. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 1/25/2011. (JMB)
November 30, 2010 34 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 13, 2010, before Judge Richard J. Arcara. Court Reporter/Transcriber Yvonne M. Garrison, Telephone number 716-847-2477. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2011. (DLC)
October 13, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held 10/13/2010 before Hon. Richard J. Arcara. Oral Argument is held as to 23 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by plaintiff. Decision is reserved. Appearances: Pltf - Terrence Connors, James Grable, Jr. And Paul Argentieri; Defts - Orin Snyder and Terrance Flynn (Court Reporter Yvonne Garrison.) (DJD) Modified on 11/29/2010 (DJD).
September 21, 2010 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Orin S. Snyder on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Orin)
September 21, 2010 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander H. Southwell on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Mark Elliot Zuckerberg (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Southwell, Alexander)
September 13, 2010 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Connors, Terrence)
August 31, 2010 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Thomas Dupree: $75.00, receipt number 019818. (DLC)
August 31, 2010 30 TEXT ORDER granting 28 Motion, conditionally upon payment of the appropriate fee to the Clerk of Court. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 8/31/2010. (JMB)
August 30, 2010 29 AFFIDAVIT of Terrance P. Flynn in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Elliott Zuckerberg, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Memorandum in Support, # 19 Certificate of Service)(Flynn, Terrance)
August 30, 2010 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas H. Dupree, Jr. by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrance P. Flynn with Ex. A, # 2 Petition and Civility Principles of Thomas H. Dupree, Jr., # 3 Certificate of Service)(Flynn, Terrance)
August 27, 2010 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance Patrick Flynn on behalf of Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. (Flynn, Terrance)
August 11, 2010 26 TEXT ORDER re plaintiffs 23 MOTION to Remand. Oral argument is scheduled for 10/13/2010 at 09:00 AM before Hon. Richard J. Arcara. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 8/11/2010. (JDK)
August 10, 2010 25 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER concerning the motion to remand and amended complaint. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 8/10/2010. (DLC)
August 9, 2010 24 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court byPaul D. Ceglia. (Connors, Terrence)
August 9, 2010 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B(1), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B(2), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Connors, Terrence)
July 23, 2010 22 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 20, 2010, before Judge Richard J. Arcara. Court Reporter/Transcriber Yvonne M. Garrison, Telephone number 716-847-2477. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/13/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2010. (DLC)
July 20, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held 7/20/2010 before Hon. Richard J. Arcara. Oral Argument is held as to 4 Motion to Vacate/Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order filed by defendant. The parties have reached an agreement that the TRO will remain in place until 7/23/2010; the parties will focus on other issues of this lawsuit. The Court determines that if the TRO remains in place until 7/23/2010, after this date the TRO will expire. The parties have reached an agreement as to the filing of an answer, motion to dismiss, etc. The Court directs the parties to reduce their agreed filing schedule to the form of a proposed order and submit it to the Court by 8/6/2010. Appearances: Pltf - Terrence Connors, James Grable, Jr., Paul Argentieri; Defts - Lisa Simpson, Michael Powers, Sean McPhee (Court Reporter Yvonne Garrison.) (DJD)
July 20, 2010 21 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 4 MOTION to Vacate /Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Simpson, Lisa)
July 20, 2010 E-Filing Notification: Username and signature do not match (refer to Administrative Procedures Guide Section 1-3c). Action required: re-file document using same signature and password and file updated proof of service. Re: 19 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 4 MOTION to Vacate /Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Robertson, Daniel) (DLC)
July 19, 2010 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. re 19 Reply/Response (Robertson, Daniel)
July 19, 2010 19 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 4 MOTION to Vacate /Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Robertson, Daniel)
July 16, 2010 18 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 4 MOTION to Vacate /Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order filed by Paul D. Ceglia. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order, # 2 Affidavit of Service)(Connors, Terrence)
July 16, 2010 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence M. Connors on behalf of Paul D. Ceglia (Connors, Terrence)
July 16, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion to Expedite and staying the Temporary Restraining Order that was granted on June 30, 2010 pending hearing on motion to dissolve scheduled for July 20, 2010. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 7/16/2010. (JMB)
July 15, 2010 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. re 12 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Dissolve TRO, 14 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 13 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Powers, Michael)
July 15, 2010 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Dissolve TRO filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Powers, Michael)
July 15, 2010 13 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 12 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Dissolve TRO filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Powers, Michael)
July 15, 2010 12 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Dissolve TRO by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc..(Powers, Michael)
July 15, 2010 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean C. McPhee on behalf of Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. (McPhee, Sean)
July 15, 2010 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Powers on behalf of Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. (Powers, Michael)
July 14, 2010 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. re 8 Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,,, (Robertson, Daniel)
July 14, 2010 8 TEXT ORDER. Oral Argument as to 4 Motion to Vacate/Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order filed by defendants is scheduled for 7/20/2010 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Richard J. Arcara. Response papers are to be filed by 7/16/2010. Counsel for defendants shall notify counsel for plaintiff of this Order as follows: 1) Inform counsel for plaintiff of this Order immediately by telephone or electronic mail; and 2) Serve a copy of this Order by 5:00 PM today via overnight express courier with delivery and signature confirmation. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on July 14, 2010. (DJD)
July 12, 2010 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. re 6 Declaration, 5 Memorandum in Support, 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 4 MOTION to Vacate /Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order (Robertson, Daniel)
July 12, 2010 E-Filing Notification: No proof of service. Action required: File proof of service Re: 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPOR, 4 MOTION to Vacate, 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, and 6 DECLARATION signed by Lisa T. Simpson. (DLC)
July 9, 2010 6 DECLARATION signed by Lisa T. Simpson re 4 MOTION to Vacate /Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Order to Show Cause)(Simpson, Lisa)
July 9, 2010 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 4 MOTION to Vacate /Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order byMark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Simpson, Lisa)
July 9, 2010 4 MOTION to Vacate /Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc..(Simpson, Lisa)
July 9, 2010 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc.. (Simpson, Lisa)
July 9, 2010 Attorney Admission fee paid for: Lisa T. Simpson on Certificate of Good Standing $200.00, receipt number 019045. (DLC)
July 9, 2010 Remark - Attorney contacted to file a Pro Hac Vice motion. (DLC)
July 9, 2010 NOTICE OF LOCAL RULE 83.2 REQUIREMENT: An attorney who does not maintain an office in this District may appear in an action, and, as appropriate, such attorney shall apply for admission pro hac vice pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.2. Such Attorney, whether or not admitted to practice in this District, shall obtain local counsel unless such requirement is waived by the Court. An Application to proceed without local counsel must be made in writing within 30 days of the attorney's initial filing and shall be granted for good cause shown and in the discretion of the Court. (DLC)
July 9, 2010 2 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. (DLC)
July 9, 2010 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. from Supreme Court State of New York Allegany County, case number 38798. (Filing fee $350.00 receipt number 019047), filed by Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) OSC, # 2 Summons, #(3) Verified Complaint, #(4) Notice to State Court, #(5) Certification.) (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ceglia v. Zuckerberg et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D. Ceglia
Represented By: Paul A. Argentieri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Elliot Zuckerberg
Represented By: Lisa T. Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa T. Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]