Adams v. Buffalo Public School District et al

Defendant: Buffalo Public School District and Patrick Fisher
Plaintiff: William F. Adams
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00435
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: New York Western District Court
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Arcara
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 23 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Patrick Fisher, 20 First MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by William F. Adams, 39 Res ponse in Opposition to Motion filed by William F. Adams, 31 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Patrick Fisher, 16 Text Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Scheduling Order DeadlinesPlaintiff's Motion to Compel (Do cket No. 20) granted in part, denied in part, as indicated in the Order. Defendant Fisher's Cross-Motion for a protective Order (Docket Nos. 23, 31) is granted in part, denied in part as indicated.Parties to submit their respective reasonabl e motion expense applications by 7/17/2014; responses due by 7/24/2014, with applications deemed submitted as of 7/24/2014 without oral argument.The document the defendant Buffalo School District sought to be filed under seal (Docket No. 38) is to be unsealed. Court Clerk to unseal Docket No. 38.SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.)Discovery completed by 9/30/2014.Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2015. If no motio ns are filed, parties are to contact Chambers of Judge Arcara to arrange final pretrial conference by 1/22/2015. Mediation To End by 1/09/2015. Motions terminated: 20 First MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by William F. Adams, 23 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Patrick Fisher.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 7/10/2014. (DRH)
July 15, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 46 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines, Terminate MotionsPrevious Order (Docket No. 46) is amended to delete the last paragraph of page 17 of that Order.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 7/15/2014. (DRH)
August 7, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTAMENDED ORDER re 46 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines, Terminate MotionsThis Amended Order incorporates changes to the Order of 7/10/2014 (Docket No. 46), see Docket Nos. 47, 51.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 8/7/2014. (DRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adams v. Buffalo Public School District et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Public School District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Fisher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F. Adams
Represented By: Prathima C. Reddy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]