Abbo-Bradley et al v. City of Niagara Falls et al

Defendant: Scott Lawn Yard, Inc., Roy's Plumbing, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Oxy, Inc., Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., Kandey Company, Inc., Gross PHC LLC, Edward S. Roberts, CECOS International, Inc., Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Niagara Falls Water Board, City of Niagara Falls and Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elena Korson, Nathan E Korson, Melanie Herr, Zachary Herr and Joann Abbo-Bradley
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00487
Filed: May 8, 2013
 
Court: New York Western District Court
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Niagara
Presiding Judge: John T. Curtin
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 125 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER granting 46 application of Defendant Glenn Springs Holdings. Plaintiffs and their attorneys are hereby enjoined, until further notice or order from this court, from conducting environmental sampling without providing GSH written notice at least 96 hours prior to sampling, contemporaneous access, and an opportunity to take split samples. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 7/18/2013. (JEC)
July 24, 2013 131 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 128 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Expedite. Counsel for GHS is directed to file a written response to the motion for stay pending appeal no more than 7 days from the entry of this order, at which time the court will take under advisement the motion for stay of the effect of the court's 7/18/2013 order pending appeal. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 7/24/2013. (JEC)
August 1, 2013 143 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 127 MOTION to Stay the effect of the Court's 125 Decision and Order pending the determination of Plaintiffs' appeal to the Second Circuit. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 7/31/2013. (JEC)
August 22, 2013 156 Featured Case -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP---DECISION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 61 Motion to remand this case to New York State Supreme Court, County of Niagara. Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees is denied. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are denied without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to transfer this action to NYS Supreme Court, Niagara County. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 8/21/2013. (JEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Abbo-Bradley et al v. City of Niagara Falls et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lawn Yard, Inc.
Represented By: Brian N. Lewandowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy's Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Knoer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OP-Tech Environmental Services
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Schulman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxy, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan
Represented By: Donna M. Lanham
Represented By: Scott T. Peloza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan
Represented By: Donna M. Lanham
Represented By: Scott T. Peloza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan
Represented By: Donna M. Lanham
Represented By: Scott T. Peloza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kandey Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gross PHC LLC
Represented By: Brian N. Lewandowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward S. Roberts
Represented By: Charles W. Malcomb, II
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Stravino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CECOS International, Inc.
Represented By: Charles E. Graney
Represented By: Nelson Perel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conestoga-Rovers & Associates
Represented By: Charles W. Malcomb, II
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Stravino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Hogan
Represented By: Donna M. Lanham
Represented By: Scott T. Peloza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara Falls Water Board
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Baase
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Niagara Falls
Represented By: Thomas M. O'Donnell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Korson
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Andrew David Fanizzi
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: William H. Mack
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Morris
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan E Korson
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Andrew David Fanizzi
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: William H. Mack
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Morris
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Herr
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Andrew David Fanizzi
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: William H. Mack
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Morris
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Herr
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Andrew David Fanizzi
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: William H. Mack
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Morris
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Abbo-Bradley
Represented By: Paul K. Barr
Represented By: Andrew David Fanizzi
Represented By: Peter A. Kraus
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: William H. Mack
Represented By: Christen Civiletto Morris
Represented By: Steven J. Phillips
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Melissa L. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]