Marbury v. Strafford County Department of Corrections, Medical Department et al

Plaintiff: Raymond G. Marbury
Defendant: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Medical Department, Raymond Bower and Tracy Warren
 
Case Number: 1:2012fp00339
Filed: October 17, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER Prohibiting Remote Electronic Access to 14 Addendum/BOP Health Services Clinical Encounter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
May 8, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Motion to Appoint Medical Expert; denying without prejudice 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Court Transcript of 4/26/12 sentencing; denying without prejudice 16 Motion to Compel Discovery - Medical Records from Strafford County Medical Dept. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
June 3, 2013 27 Featured Case ///ORDER approving 26 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
October 17, 2012 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Financial Affidavit and Prisoner Consent Form filed by Raymond G. Marbury, initial fee of $5.50. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 12/17/2012(jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Marbury v. Strafford County Department of Corrections, Medical Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond G. Marbury
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Medical Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Bower
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Warren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]