Wooton v. CL, LLC et al

Plaintiff: John D Wooton
Defendant: CL, LLC, Terrence Coyle, Jay R Lundblad, Peter Chicouris, Anderson Midgett, Stockton Midgett and Midgett Realty, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00034
Filed: June 30, 2009
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Northern Division Office
County: DARE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 AMENDED Motion for Default Judgment - It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that default judgment is hereby entered against defendants CL, LLC and Terrence Coyle on plaintiff's claims. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECRE ED that plaintiff is awarded the sum of $105,916.75 in damages from defendant CL; the sum of $520,922.37 in damages from defendant CL and defendant Coyle, who are jointly and severally liable for that amount; the sum of $81,735.00 in a ttorneys fees from defendant CL and defendant Coyle, who are jointly and severally liable for that amount; and the sum of $2,793.55 in costs from defendant CL and defendant Coyle, who are jointly and severally liable for that amount. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that post-judgment interest on these amounts shall accrue at the rate specified in 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/01/2011. (Baker, C.)
July 12, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 07/12/2011. (Baker, C.)
September 27, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to amend 23 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Specifically, the motion is allowed as to defendant CL, LLC, and Terrence. Coyle, against whom defaults previously were entered, and who now shall have an additional twenty-one (21) days within which to respond from date of service of this order and plaintiff's amended complaint. The motion is also allowed as to defendant Peter Chicouris and Midgett Realty, Inc., whose responses have been filed. However, be cause the amended complaint cannot survive the individual Midgett defendants' motion to dismiss, it is denied with respect to defendants Anderson and Stockton Midgett. The motion is not adjudicated as against defendant Lundblad, who is protected by the automatic stay provision of the Bankruptcy Code. The motions to dismiss of defendants Anderson Midgett and Stockton Midgett 15 and defendant Peter Chicouris 38 are GRANTED. All claims against these defendants are dismissed. Plaintiffs cla ims against defendants CL, LLC, Terrence Coyle, and Midgett Realty, Inc. remain pending. Cross-claims of Anderson and Stockton Midgett against CL, LLC and Terrence Coyle also remain pending. Plaintiff's claims and the Midgetts' cross-claims against Jay Robert Lundblad remained stayed pending resolution of Lundblad's bankruptcy case. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/27/2010. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
December 29, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying as moot 78 Motion to Alter Judgment and denying motion to amend complaint; and, denying 87 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - Where the Midgetts, Chicouris, and M idgett Realty have each been dismissed as defendants in this action, plaintiff's claims remain only against defendant CL, LLC ("CL"), Terrence Coyle ("Coyle"), and Jay Robert Lundblad ("Lundblad"). Also pending are the Midgetts' crossclaims against these three defendants. Pursuant to the case management order, as amended, the parties have until February 28, 2011, to file any dispositive motions. Default was entered against CL and Coyle by order dated Janua ry 28, 2010. Although Lundblad has yet to appear in this matter, he is protected by the automatic stay provision of 11 U.S.C. § 362 by virtue of his voluntary bankruptcy petition filed in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Western Distri ct of Pennsylvania on or about March 12, 2010. Counsel for plaintiff and counsel for crossclaimants Anderson and Stockton Midgett shall notify the court immediately upon the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceedings involving Lundblad by filing with t his court a notice stating the disposition of the bankruptcy case and including the final order in the bankruptcy matter or other disposing order issued by the bankruptcy court. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/28/2010. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
February 25, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 91 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)- Plaintiff is directed to proceed with his claims against the remaining defendants to bring this action to a close. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/24/2011. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wooton v. CL, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Wooton
Represented By: Dennis C. Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CL, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Coyle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay R Lundblad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Chicouris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Midgett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stockton Midgett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midgett Realty, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]