Shellfish To Go II, Inc. v. Dirty Dick's, Inc.

Plaintiff: Shellfish To Go II, Inc.
Defendant: Dirty Dick's, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00009
Filed: February 20, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Northern Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Entry of Default - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 06/28/2013. (Baker, C.)
September 25, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as moot in remaining part 12 Motion for Default Judgment - Plaintiff now seeks to show that this case is exceptional and that plaintiff is entitled to attorneys' fees as the prevailing party under the Lanham Act, the amount o f which it proffers will be shown in subsequent filing. Plaintiff also seeks to recover its costs. The court holds in abeyance decision on whether this case is exceptional. Leave is given to plaintiff of fourteen (14) days within which to make its supplemental filings, in furtherance of its new requests. Thereafter the court will take up and decide those issues in conclusion of the case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/25/2013. (Baker, C.)
October 11, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Shellfish To Go II, Inc. and against Dirty Dick's, Inc. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 10/11/2013. (Baker, C.)
January 22, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding 18 Motion for Bill of Costs - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 01/22/2014. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Shellfish To Go II, Inc. v. Dirty Dick's, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shellfish To Go II, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Ladenheim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirty Dick's, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]