North Carolina Environmental Justice Network et al v. Taylor et al

Plaintiff: North Carolina Environmental Justice Network, Neuse River Foundation, Inc. and Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc.
Defendant: Taylor Finishing, Inc., Donald Taylor, Frederick A. McLawhorn, Justin T. McLawhorn and Aaron McLawhorn
Case Number: 4:2012cv00154
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: LENOIR
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 104 Motion to Strike: In sum, the court DENIES defendants' motion to strike plaintiffs' jury demand on the issue of liability for civil penalties. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/29/14. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (O'Brien, C.)
April 13, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court adopts the Memorandum and Recommendation and Order 148 and overrules the objections. Defendants' joint motion for reconsideration and clarification 150 and the Taylor defendants' supplemental motion for reconsideration 153 are DENIED. Defendants' motion to strike 143 , defendants' motion to expedite 153 , and plaintiffs' motion to reconsider 119 are DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/13/2015. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. (O'Brien, C.)
April 24, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and denying as moot 30 , 36 , and 48 Motions to Dismiss. Counsel should file the second amended complaint attached to its motion no later than 4/30/2013. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/24/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
August 26, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/26/2013. (Sawyer, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Carolina Environmental Justice Network et al v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Environmental Justice Network
Represented By: Chinelo E. Dike-Minor
Represented By: Stanley B. Green
Represented By: Michael T. Leigh
Represented By: Bethany Davis Noll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neuse River Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly H. Foster
Represented By: Stanley B. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly H. Foster
Represented By: Stanley B. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Finishing, Inc.
Represented By: Donalt J. Eglinton
Represented By: Frank H. Sheffield, Jr.
Represented By: Amy P. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Taylor
Represented By: Donalt J. Eglinton
Represented By: Frank H. Sheffield, Jr.
Represented By: Amy P. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick A. McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin T. McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron McLawhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.