Carter v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Steven T. Carter
Case Number: 4:2013cv00126
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: CRAVEN
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 1/15/2014. (Sawyer, D.)
January 15, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court grants Defendant's Motion for Remand [D.E. 25], and hereby reverses the Commissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remands the case to the Commissioner for further proceedings. Signed by Debby Sawyer, Deputy Clerk for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 1/15/2014. (Sawyer, D.)
January 24, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 1/24/2014. (Sawyer, D.)
November 26, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for Attorney Fees - Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/26/2014. (Tripp, S.)
December 12, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/12/2014. (Edwards, S.)
December 12, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Commissioner of Social Security pay to Plaintiffs counsel, the sum of $3,969.50 from Plaintiffs back benefits and upon the payment of such sum this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 12/12/2014. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Thomas M. Nanni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven T. Carter
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]