U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Yellowstone Partners, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Yellowstone Partners, Inc. and Dennis Todd Hagemann
Case Number: 5:2010cv00085
Filed: March 9, 2010
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion for Sale of Real Estate - The Receiver is authorized to sell the Property as set forth in the motion and accompanying contract of sale. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/14/2013. (Baker, C.)
August 6, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 121 MOTION to Establish Claim Procedures and to Approve Claim Form - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/06/2013. (Baker, C.)
November 5, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 131 Motion for Disbursement of Funds - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/05/2013. (Baker, C.)
February 18, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 131 Motion for Disbursement of Funds and 148 Motion for Attorney Fees - the court DIRECTS the receiver to (1) distribute the receivership estate among all of the claimants who filed approved claims identified in the receiver' ;s final report and motion for approval, as updated (DE 131, 132; see DE 144), and (2) use the net pro rata method as set forth in plaintiff's recommendation to achieve this result. The court DIRECTS plaintiff to update Exhibit A of its r ecommendation to reflect the addition of the net claims of Adam Grossman and Michael D. Grossman, and to reflect the final amount of funds available for distribution. The court DIRECTS plaintiff to confer with the receiver and file its updated exhibi t within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, for the record in this case. In addition, for the reasons stated herein, the receiver's thirty-fourth motion for attorney's fees (DE 148) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/18/2014. (Baker, C.)
April 16, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 156 Motion for Authority to Convey Real Estate - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/16/2014. (Baker, C.)
May 9, 2014 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER'S REVISED FINAL REPORT, APPLICATION FOR FINAL PAYMENT OF RECEIVERSHIP FEES, AND TERMINATING RECEIVERSHIP CASE - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/08/2014. (Baker, C.)
March 1, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, PERMANENT INJUNCTION, CIVIL MONETARY PENALTY, AND ANCILLARY EQUITABLE RELIEF - Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/01/2011. (Baker, C.)
March 7, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission against Yellowstone Partners, Inc. and Dennis Todd Hagemann - Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 03/07/2011. (Baker, C.)
June 16, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 47 Motion for Allowance of Fees - The court DIRECTS the receiver to file a second interim receivership report and plan within thirty (30) days of date of entry of this order. The receiver's first application for fees (DE # 47) is ALLOWED IN PART. The receiver is allowed professional fees in the amount of $8,545.00 and costs in the amount of $249.29. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/26/2011. (Baker, C.)
July 20, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion to Sell Recievership Realty - Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/19/2011. (Baker, C.)
August 10, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 54 Second Motion for Allowance of Fees and 56 Third Motion for Allowance of Fees - The court increases the cap on professional fees to ten percent (10%) on receipts and disbursements. For services rendered between May 11, 2011, and July 10, 2011, the receiver is ALLOWED $9,960.00 in professional fees and $212.51 in expenses. The receiver further is DIRECTED to provide a third interim receivership report and plan within thirty (30) days of date of entry of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/09/2011. (Baker, C.)
September 30, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Fourth MOTION for Allowance of Fees and 62 Fifth MOTION for Attorney Fees - For services rendered between July 11, 2011, and September 10, 2011, the receiver is ALLOWED $4,585.00 in professional fees and $15.21 in expenses. The receiver further is DIRECTED to provide a fourth interim receivership report and plan within thirty (30) days of date of entry of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/30/2011. (Baker, C.)
October 19, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Motion to Sell Receivership Automobile - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/19/2011. (Baker, C.)
December 15, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Sixth Motion for Attorney Fees and 69 Seventh Motion for Attorney Fees - For services rendered between September 11, 2011, and November 10, 2011, the receiver is ALLOWED $2,295.00 in professional fees and $12.56 in ex penses. The receiver further is DIRECTED to provide a fifth interim receivership report and plan, and to include therein the specific information outlined in the attached order, within thirty (30) days of date of entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/14/2011. (Baker, C.)
February 28, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 71 Motion for Attorney Fees and 73 Motion for Attorney Fees (with modification to reflect the established paralegal rate of $50.00 per hour) - For services rendered between November 11, 2011, and January 10, 2011, th e receiver is ALLOWED $1,290.00 in professional fees and $3.76 in expenses. The court DIRECTS the receiver to file a sixth interim receivership report and plan within thirty (30) days of date of entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/27/2012. (Baker, C.)
April 11, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Tenth Motion for Attorney Fees and 77 Eleventh Motion for Attorney Fees - For services rendered between January 11, 2012, and March 10, 2012, the receiver is ALLOWED $1,000.00 in professional fees. The court DIRECTS the receiver to file a seventh interim receivership report and plan within thirty (30) days of date of entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/10/2012. (Baker, C.)
June 8, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The receiver's twelfth (DE # 80) and thirteenth (DE # 82) applications for fees are ALLOWED. For services rendered between March 11, 2012, and May 10, 2012, the receiver is ALLOWED $1,000.00 in professional fees. The court DIRECTS t he receiver to file an eighth interim receivership report and plan within thirty (30) days of date of entry of this order. The receiver shall include therein an update ofthe receipts and disbursements charts included on pages eight and nine of his fifth interim report. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/08/2012. (Baker, C.)
August 7, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Fourteenth Motion for Attorney Fees and 86 Fifteenth Motion for Attorney Fees - For services rendered between May 11, 2012, and July 10, 2012, the receiver is ALLOWED $620.00 in professional fees. The court DIRECTS the receiver to file a ninth interim receivership report and plan within ninety (90) days of entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/6/2012. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Yellowstone Partners, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowstone Partners, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Todd Hagemann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]