North Carolina Wildlife Federation et al v. NCDOT et al

Plaintiff: North Carolina Wildlife Federation, Clean Air Carolina and Yadkin Riverkeeper
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Transportation, Eugene A Conti, Jr., Federal Highway Administration and John F. Sullivan, III
 
Case Number: 5:2010cv00476
Filed: November 2, 2010
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2010 28 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiffs have failed to meet the heavy burden necessary to obtain a preliminary injunction. Thus, plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED without prejudice [D.E. 8]. Plaintiffs' motion to strike is DENIED [D.E. 25 ]. Defendants shall complete and serve the administrative record not later than January 31, 2011. The court will hold a status conference in this case on Friday, February 4,2011, at 10:00 a.m. in Raleigh. Counsel should be prepared to discuss scheduling and discovery issues at the status conference. The court intends to move this case expeditiously to a decision on the merits on a full record. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 12/30/2010. (Sawyer, D.)
February 25, 2011 36 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Joint Motion for Briefing and Hearing Schedule. Counsel should read the Order in its entirety for all critical deadlines. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/25/2011. (Sawyer, D.)
October 24, 2011 65 Featured Case ORDER denying 47 Motion for Summary Judgment by plaintiffs North Carolina Wildlife Federation, Clean Air Carolina, and Yadkin Riverkeeper; granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment by defendants Federal Highway Administration and John F. Sullivan; and, granting 52 Motion for Summary Judgment by defendants North Carolina Department of Transportation and Eugene Conti. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/24/2011. (Richards, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: North Carolina Wildlife Federation et al v. NCDOT et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Wildlife Federation
Represented By: Chandra T. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clean Air Carolina
Represented By: Chandra T. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yadkin Riverkeeper
Represented By: Chandra T. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Transportation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene A Conti, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Sullivan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]