Crispin v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, et al.

Defendant: Bank of America, National Association, Substitute Trustee Services, Inc. and BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Plaintiff: Graham A. Crispin
 
Case Number: 5:2011cv00375
Filed: July 18, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss and denying 19 Motion to Dismiss - The court herein provides notice that because the defendants attached matters outside the complaint to their motions, the court construes the same as motions for summary judg ment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. Where the Case Management Order currently in place provides for a deadline of July 13, 2012, for the filing of dispositive motions, the court sees no reason to alter such deadline. The parties may undertake discov ery to the extent necessary to obtain materials related to the motions for summary judgment. Unless objection to this deadline is raised by a party through a motion requesting specific relief, such date will be the deadline for the parties to file al l other dispositive motions. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause within fourteen (14) days as to why the docket should not reflect that his motion for preliminary injunction is no longer pending. If plaintiff does not respond, the Clerk is DIRECTED to conform the docket to reflect that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is not currently pending for decision. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/14/2011. (Baker, C.)
June 1, 2012 55 Featured Case ORDER regarding 47 Motion to Excuse Physical Attendance at Mediated Settlement Conference - The undersigned finds that the selected mediator, Mr. Little, is best situated to determine whether the physical presence of a BANA representative is nece ssary to ensure effective mediation. Therefore, the parties are DIRECTED to request and adhere to Mr. Little's decision as to whether a BANA representative can participate telephonically in the mediated settlement conference. Should Mr. Little d etermine that physical attendance is required, the parties may postpone if necessary said conference, up to thirty (30) days from entry of this order, to enable BANA to arrange for cost efficient travel of its selected representative to the mediation. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/01/2012. (Baker, C.)
August 7, 2012 60 Featured Case ORDER granting 58 Request for Disolution of Preliminary Injunction - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/6/2012. (Baker, C.)
August 13, 2012 61 Featured Case ORDER - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlement not be consummated wit hin forty-five (45) days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice on or before Friday, September 21, 2012. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/13/2012. (Baker, C.)
July 25, 2011 9 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER granting in part 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Defendants shall take no further action in regard to foreclosure of the property described in the Complaint and Amended Complaint, which has a street address of 107 Candy Apple Co urt, Cary, N.C., and no foreclosure hearing or sale shall be held in Wake County special proceeding no. 10 SP 4429 during the pendency of this action or until further orders of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/25/2011. Consideration of other relief requested in the Motion will be deferred pending further orders of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/25/2011. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Crispin v. BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Jennie Cordis Boswell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Substitute Trustee Services, Inc.
Represented By: Hilton Terry Hutchens, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Jennie Cordis Boswell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graham A. Crispin
Represented By: Celie Benton Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]