UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Sanchez-Martinez, et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Ricardo Sanchez-Martinez, Beatriz Sanchez, Dulche Rodriguez and RSM Framing Contractors, LLC
Case Number: 5:2011cv00657
Filed: November 17, 2011
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: JOHNSTON
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Default Judgment - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/16/2012. (Baker, C.)
May 24, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered May 18, 2012, that plaintiff's motion for default judgment is granted. Judgment is entered, in favor of plaintiff and against defendant Ricardo Sanc hez-Martinez, for unpaid 2000, 2001, 2002, 2003, 2004, 2005, and 2006 federal individual income taxes, penalties and interest in the total amount of $2,813,106.55 plus statutory interest under 26 U.S.C. § 6621 from February 24, 2012, until paid. Further, plaintiff has valid and existing federal tax liens against all property and rights to property owned by defendant Ricardo Sanchez-Martinez. The nominee federal tax liens against defendants RSM Framing Contractors, LLC, and Beatriz Sanc hez, as nominees of Ricardo Sanchez-Martinez are foreclosed against the subject property, which is to be sold pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§2001 and 2002 in the manner set forth more specifically within the courts May 18, 2012. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 05/24/2012. (Baker, C.)
July 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Confirmation of Sale of Real Property - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/18/2013. (Baker, C.)
February 13, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Entry of Default as to all defendants - Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 02/13/2012. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Sanchez-Martinez, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Lawrence P. Blaskopf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Sanchez-Martinez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatriz Sanchez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dulche Rodriguez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSM Framing Contractors, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]