Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Joyner, et al

Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Barney G. Joyner Family Trust, Joyner Real Estate Holdings, LLC, David L Joyner and Joyner Marina, LLC
Case Number: 5:2011cv00762
Filed: December 29, 2011
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Stay - The Parties are allowed through and including May 1, 2013 to complete the appraisal of the replacement collateral, execute settlement documents and file the Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/02/2013. (Baker, C.)
April 26, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Stay - The parties are allowed an additional three weeks through and including May 22, 2013 to complete the review of the three additional parcels, execute settlement documents and file the Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/26/2013. (Baker, C.)
June 18, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Stay - The parties have through and including July 10, 2013 to receive and review the appraisal and environmental reports on the three additional parcels, execute settlement documents and file the Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/18/2013. (Baker, C.)
July 16, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Stay - The parties have through and including July 31, 2013 to receive and review the appraisal and environmental reports on the three additional parcels, execute settlement documents and file the Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/16/2013. (Baker, C.)
August 1, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Seventh Motion to Stay - The parties have through and including August 14, 2013 to receive and review the appraisal and environmental reports on the three additional parcels, execute settlement documents and file the Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/01/2013. (Baker, C.)
December 30, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to re-assign this case to another district court judge so as to avoid any appearance of a conflict. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 12/30/2011. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Joyner, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brian C. Fork
Represented By: A. Lee Hogewood, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barney G. Joyner Family Trust
Represented By: Dirk W. Siegmund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyner Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Dirk W. Siegmund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Joyner
Represented By: Dirk W. Siegmund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyner Marina, LLC
Represented By: Dirk W. Siegmund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]