Smallwood v. Irwin Mortgage Corporation et al

Defendant: Everhome Mortgage Company, Shapiro & Ingle, LLP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., MersCorp/Mers, Inc., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, John Does 1-5 and Irwin Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Cynthia Smallwood
Case Number: 5:2012cv00047
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion for Entry of Default and the clerk will reissue summons as to this defendant, Irwin Mortgage Corporation. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 4/12/2013. (Edwards, S.)
September 3, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 29 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The only remaining live claim is the plaintiff's claim for breach of contract. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/30/2013. (Fisher, M.)
February 3, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 59 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and DENYING 66 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close the file. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/2/2014. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smallwood v. Irwin Mortgage Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everhome Mortgage Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro & Ingle, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MersCorp/Mers, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin Mortgage Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Smallwood
Represented By: Harold E. Lucas
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Nowak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]