Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation v. Garner et al

Defendant: Collin Yarbrough, Rick Barefoot, Steven Penny, Nona Powers and Stephen Winn
Plaintiff: Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation
Case Number: 5:2012cv00053
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 100 Memorandum and Recommendations. Defendant Yarborough's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. As the time for filing dispositive motions in this matter has passed, the clerk is directed to refer this matter for a pretrial conference. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/16/2014. Copy of Order mailed to pro se defendants via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
June 24, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 103 Motion for a Court-Hosted Settlement Conference. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/23/2014. Copy mailed to all pro se parties via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
February 7, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion to Dismiss; denying 48 Motion to Dismiss. The Court hereby ORDERS that the five severed Defendants against whom new actions have been brought in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina (Collin Yarbrough, Nona Powers, Stephen Winn, Rick Barefoot, and Steven Perry) are TRANSFERRED to that District. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/7/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)[Transferred from North Carolina Western on 2/9/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation v. Garner et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin Yarbrough
Represented By: Daniel T. Blue, III
Represented By: Daniel T Blue, III
Represented By: Dhamian A. Blue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Barefoot
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Penny
Represented By: Daniel T Blue, III
Represented By: Daniel T. Blue, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nona Powers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Winn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slep-Tone Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: James M. Harrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]