Speaks et al v. U.S. Tobacco Cooperative, Inc.

Plaintiff: Teresa M. Speaks, Toby Speaks, Stanley Smith, Eddie Brown, Robert Poindexter, Mike Mitchell, Roy L. Cook, Alex Shugart, H. Randle Wood, Robin Rogers and Daniel Lee Nelson
Defendant: U.S. Tobacco Cooperative, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00729
Filed: October 31, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/17/2012. (Sawyer, D.)
March 22, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 3/22/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
June 25, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/24/2013. (Sawyer, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Speaks et al v. U.S. Tobacco Cooperative, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa M. Speaks
Represented By: William Grainger Wright, Sr.
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Speaks
Represented By: William Grainger Wright, Sr.
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Smith
Represented By: William Grainger Wright, Sr.
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Brown
Represented By: William Grainger Wright, Sr.
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Poindexter
Represented By: William Grainger Wright, Sr.
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Mitchell
Represented By: William Grainger Wright, Sr.
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy L. Cook
Represented By: William Grainger Wright, Sr.
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Shugart
Represented By: William Grainger Wright, Sr.
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Randle Wood
Represented By: William Grainger Wright, Sr.
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Rogers
Represented By: William Grainger Wright, Sr.
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Nelson
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Represented By: William Grainger Wright, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Tobacco Cooperative, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]