Universal Mania, Inc. v. Otter Products, LLC

Plaintiff: Universal Mania, Inc.
Defendant: Otter Products, LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv00094
Filed: February 8, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/30/2013. (Baker, C.)
October 24, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlement not be consummated wit hin forty-five (45) days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice or proposed Consent Judgment on or before Monday, January 6, 2014. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/24/2013. (Baker, C.)
December 17, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/17/2013. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Mania, Inc. v. Otter Products, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Mania, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Meynardie
Represented By: Ben Lila
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otter Products, LLC
Represented By: John Christopher Jackson
Represented By: John Timothy Kivus
Represented By: W. Swain Wood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]