Rudisill v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Plaintiff: Cathy L. Rudisill
Defendant: John McHugh and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2013cv00110
Filed: February 15, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Qualify Expert; granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Leave to File; granting 35 Motion for Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/20/2014. (Edwards, S.)
April 22, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Compel. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 4/21/2014. (Edwards, S.)
June 18, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion to Dismiss Party - Motion to Drop Party Pursuant to Rule 21 . Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 6/18/2014. (Grady, B.)
June 23, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion to Stay discovery for a period of 90 days and directing the parties to submit a revised discovery plan within 30 days thereafter. Counsel is remided to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 6/23/2014. (Edwards, S.)
September 2, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion to Renew Motion to Dismiss, granting 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and granting 57 Motion for Ruling on Motions to Dismiss. The parties are reminded to read the order in its entirety for details. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 9/2/2014. (Grady, B.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rudisill v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy L. Rudisill
Represented By: Timothy C. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Ronnie M. Mitchell
Represented By: Grant S. Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McHugh
Represented By: Sharon C. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Sharon C. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]