Adams v. Regional Credit Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Takisha Adams
Defendant: Regional Credit Solutions, Inc., William Scudder and Northern Resolution Group, LLC
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00128
Filed: February 21, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion for Entry of Default. Entry of Default is hereby entered against Defendants Scudder and Northern Resolution Group, LLC. Entry of Default is denied as to Defendant Regional Credit Solutions, Inc. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 5/22/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
June 26, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 6/26/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
August 26, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/25/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
August 26, 2013 17 Featured Case JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is GRANTED and Plaintiff has judgment against Regional Credit Solutions, Inc., William Scudder, individually, and Northern Resolutions Group, LLC in the amount of $5,210.25. Signed by Debby Sawyer, Deputy Clerk for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 8/26/2013. (Sawyer, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adams v. Regional Credit Solutions, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takisha Adams
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Dowd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Credit Solutions, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Scudder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Resolution Group, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]