Bank of America, N.A. v. Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, et al
Appellee: |
Shopton Ridge 30-C, LLC, Whitehall Corporate Center #4, LLC, Whitehall Corporate Center #5, LLC, Whitehall Corporate Center #6, LLC, Brier Creek Office #6, LLC, Service Retail at Brier Creek, LLC, Service Retail at Whitehall II Limited Partnership, Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership and Brier Creek Office #4, LLC |
Appellant: |
Bank of America, N.A. |
Case Number: |
5:2013cv00130 |
Filed: |
February 22, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Western Division Office |
County: |
WAKE |
Presiding Judge: |
Louise Wood Flanagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Bankruptcy Appeal (801) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 26, 2013 |
Filing
55
ORDER granting 52 Motion to Stay the Bankruptcy Appeals and Request for Extension of Time to File Appellees' Brief and Appellant's Reply Brief - The bankruptcy appeals shall be stayed up to and until May 8, 2013. The Appellees shall have up to and until May 16, 2013 to file an Appellee Brief. Bank of America shall have up to and until May 24, 2013 to file a Reply Brief. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/26/2013. (Baker, C.)
|
March 26, 2013 |
Filing
51
ORDER granting 49 Motion to Stay the Bankruptcy Appeals and Request for Extension of Time to File Appellee's Brief and Appellant's Reply Brief - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/26/2013. (Baker, C.)
|
March 15, 2013 |
Filing
48
ORDER granting 43 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/15/2013. (Tripp, S.)
|
March 6, 2013 |
Filing
38
ORDER granting 36 Motion to Consolidate Cases - The above-captioned cases are consolidated into Bank of America, N.A. v. Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, Case No. 13-CV-00130-FL. Future filings shall be filled only in case number 13-CV-00130-FL, but shall carry the captions and case numbers for both cases. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/06/2013. (Baker, C.)
|
March 1, 2013 |
Filing
35
ORDER granting 32 Motion to Shorten Response Time regarding 30 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal - Responses to Bank of America N.A.'s Motion to Stay January 14, 2013 Bankruptcy Order Pending Appeal shall be filed on or before March 8, 2013. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/01/2013. (Baker, C.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Shopton Ridge 30-C, LLC |
Represented By: |
C. Richard Rayburn, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Vicki L. Parrott |
Represented By: |
John A. Northen |
Represented By: |
David S. Melin |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Whitehall Corporate Center #4, LLC |
Represented By: |
C. Richard Rayburn, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Vicki L. Parrott |
Represented By: |
John A. Northen |
Represented By: |
David S. Melin |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Whitehall Corporate Center #5, LLC |
Represented By: |
C. Richard Rayburn, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Vicki L. Parrott |
Represented By: |
John A. Northen |
Represented By: |
David S. Melin |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Whitehall Corporate Center #6, LLC |
Represented By: |
John A. Northen |
Represented By: |
David S. Melin |
Represented By: |
Vicki L. Parrott |
Represented By: |
C. Richard Rayburn, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Brier Creek Office #6, LLC |
Represented By: |
C. Richard Rayburn, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Vicki L. Parrott |
Represented By: |
John A. Northen |
Represented By: |
David S. Melin |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Service Retail at Brier Creek, LLC |
Represented By: |
C. Richard Rayburn, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Vicki L. Parrott |
Represented By: |
John A. Northen |
Represented By: |
David S. Melin |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Service Retail at Whitehall II Limited Partnership |
Represented By: |
C. Richard Rayburn, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Vicki L. Parrott |
Represented By: |
John A. Northen |
Represented By: |
David S. Melin |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership |
Represented By: |
C. Richard Rayburn, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Vicki L. Parrott |
Represented By: |
John A. Northen |
Represented By: |
David S. Melin |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Brier Creek Office #4, LLC |
Represented By: |
C. Richard Rayburn, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Vicki L. Parrott |
Represented By: |
David S. Melin |
Represented By: |
John A. Northen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellant: Bank of America, N.A. |
Represented By: |
George F. Sanderson, III |
Represented By: |
Lauren A. Miller |
Represented By: |
Charles N. Anderson, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?