Buckner v. Lew, et al

Defendant: Jacob J. Lew, Mariam G. Harvey, Robert L. Hunt and Jacqueline A. Berrien
Plaintiff: Nannette F. Buckner
Case Number: 5:2013cv00199
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 34 Memorandum and Recommendation and granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss - Defendants' motion to dismiss part of plaintiff's retaliation claim pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b (1) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's ADEA and retaliation claim against defendant Lew pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) is DENIED. Accordingly, plaintiff's ADEA and retaliation claim a gainst defendant Lew are allowed to proceed. All other claims against defendant Lew and all claims against the remaining defendants are DISMISSED under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). The court STRIKES plaintiff's demand for jury trial as to plaintiff's ADEA claim. The clerk is DIRECTED to continue management of this case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/19/2014. (Baker, C.)
July 31, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Joint Motion for Court-Hosted Settlement Conference with a Magistrate Judge - Magistrate Judge Swank will notify the parties how she wishes to proceed concerning the settlement conference, and the date on which it will be held. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/31/2014. (Baker, C.)
September 22, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring 49 Motion to Compel and Motion for Sanctions; 55 Motion to Compel; and 60 Motion for Protective Order to U.S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank and granting 63 MOTION to Vacate 48 Order - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/22/2014. (Baker, C.)
September 24, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as moot 49 Motion to Compel and Motion for Sanctions; 55 Motion to Compel; and 60 Motion for Protective Order - The court hereby ORDERS that the government shall have until October 15, 2014, to produce, pursuant to the parties agreement at the Rule 16 conference, the remaining documents and a privilege log listing any responsive documents not produced. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 09/24/2014. (Baker, C.)
December 17, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as moot 87 Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 12/17/2014. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckner v. Lew, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob J. Lew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariam G. Harvey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Hunt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline A. Berrien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nannette F. Buckner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]