Reliastar Life Insurance Company v. Laschkewitsch

Plaintiff: Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Defendant: John B. Laschkewitsch
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00210
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2014 100 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 65 Defendant's Motion Regarding Sufficiency of Plaintiff's Answers and Objections, and DENYING 71 Defendant's Motion for Discovery Sanctions. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/6/2014. Copy mailed to pro se defendant via US mail. (Fisher, M.)
March 13, 2014 108 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 88 Motion to Seal Document. The documents at 84 , 85 , 86 , and 87 shall remain under seal. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/13/2014. Copy mailed to pro se defendant via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
April 14, 2014 130 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 81 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Defendant's Expert, DENYING 98 Defendant's Motion for Order to Show Cause, GRANTING 106 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal, and GRANTING 117 Plaintiffs Motion to Seal. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/13/2014. Copy mailed to pro se defendant via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
April 25, 2014 136 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 124 Defendant's Motion to Strike Reply at 118 . Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/24/2014. Copy mailed to pro se defendant via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
May 28, 2014 141 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 83 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 89 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 101 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Evidence and Unsupported Allegations; DENYING 128 Defendant's Motio n to Exclude Evidence and Unsupported Allegations; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 132 Defendant's Motion to Seal; DENYING AS MOOT 137 Plaintiff's Proposed Sealed Motion; and GRANTING 139 Defendant's Motion to Seal. The Court hereby declares and adjudges that the policy at issue bearing policy number AD20260690 is null, void, and rescinded ab intitio due to the fraudulent, willfully false, and material misrepresentations and omissions that the defendant and insured made in applying for the policy. Plaintiff is awarded costs taxed against the defendant. Further, the plaintiff is awarded $1,946.16 in damages and all post-judgment interest recoverable by law. The clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. The plaintiff if ordered to brief the Court on the matter of costs and reasonable attorney's fees. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/23/2014. Copy mailed to pro se defendant via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
August 12, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 18 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/10/2013. Counsel is directed to read Order in its entirety for critical information. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
February 5, 2014 80 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 77 Motion for Leave to Issue Document Subpoena. This Court find that Plaintiff has shown good cause to be allowed to subpoena documents from Financial Security Associates after the discovery deadline. Plaintiff is hereby ALLOWED to issue a subpoena to FInancial Security Associates. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/5/2014. Copy mailed to pro se defendant via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reliastar Life Insurance Company v. Laschkewitsch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher J. Blake
Represented By: David T. McDowell
Represented By: Hutson B. Smelley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B. Laschkewitsch
Represented By: Coy E. Brewer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]