Minish v. Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau

Defendant: Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau
Plaintiff: Diane Minish
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00256
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 9 Motion for Attorney Fees. Should Plaintiff wish to proceed in this case, she isDIRECTED to file supplemental proof of service within thirty days of this order. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for detailed information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 12/11/2013. (Edwards, S.)
September 8, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - The court ORDERS that the entry of default [DE-6] is VACATED, and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Jacqueline B. Grady for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court, on 9/8/2014. (Grady, B.)
July 17, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Entry of Default against defendant Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 7/17/2013. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Minish v. Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Minish
Represented By: Mitchel Erik Luxenburg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]