Campbell Alliance Group, Inc. v. Dandekar, et al

Defendant: Ashwin Dandekar and Emily Hua
Plaintiff: Campbell Alliance Group, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00415
Filed: June 7, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/10/2013. (Baker, C.)
January 3, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 15 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/3/2014. (Tripp, S.)
January 7, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - This court finds that plaintiff has demonstrated that it is likely to suffer irreparable harm in the form of loss of customer business and goodwill i n the absence of a temporary restraining order. Defendants are temporarily restrained from using and disclosing, in any manner, plaintiff's confidential information allegedly contained in files on the Seagate external storage device or any compu ting device, including hard drives, CD or DVD-ROM storage media, USB flash drives, or other devices, to which those files allegedly have been downloaded. Said information and materials shall be identified, segregated by defendants and preserved in li tigation, with index to be given by defendants to plaintiff within seven days hereof accounting for all of plaintiff's confidential information at issue here involving any file, data, device, and/or information allegedly removed from plaintiff. Plaintiff is not required to post any bond because the court waives the security requirement. This court finds that a prohibitory temporary restraining order is appropriate here. Thus, defendants are ordered to preserve plaintiff' ;s confidential information allegedly contained in files on the Seagate external storage device or any computing device, including hard drives, CD or DVDROM storage media, USB flash drives, or other devices, to which those files allegedly have been d ownloaded, and to account for that information which is subject to this order. This order shall take effect at 4:00 p.m. EST, Tuesday January 7, 2014. This order shall expire at 4:00 p.m. EST, Tuesday January 21, 2014. The parties shall confer to re ach consensus as to terms for continuation of this order up to and until date of decision on the motion for preliminary and permanent injunction, set for hearing February 25, 2014, and report to the court January 17, 2014. In the event no consensus i s reached on or before that date, evidenced by submission of the form of an agreed upon, proposed order, the court previews here it will 1) extend the restraints herein ordered a further fourteen (14) days; 2) hear at New Bern January 30, 2014, at 9:00 a.m., plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction as recently supplemented; and 3) leave for hearing February 25, 2014, the motion for permanent injunction. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/07/2014. (Baker, C.)
January 13, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Renewed Motion for Expanded Expedited Discovery - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/13/2014. (Baker, C.)
January 17, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - The Temporary Restraining Order set forth in the attached document shall remain in effect up to and until date of decision on the Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/17/2014. (Baker, C.)
February 20, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/20/2014. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Campbell Alliance Group, Inc. v. Dandekar, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashwin Dandekar
Represented By: John Allen Thomas
Represented By: Phillip J. Strach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Hua
Represented By: Phillip J. Strach
Represented By: John Allen Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campbell Alliance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Ceglowski
Represented By: Daniel G. Cahill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]