LSCG Fund 18, LLC v. Shotwell Landfill, Inc. et al
Appellant: |
LSCG Fund 18, LLC |
Appellee: |
Shotwell Landfill, Inc., Capitol Waste Transfer, LLC, Capitol Recycling, LLC, Debris Removal Partners, LLC, Shotwell Transfer Station II, Inc. and King's Grading, Inc. |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv00541 |
Filed: |
September 25, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Western Division Office |
County: |
WAKE |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Fox |
Nature of Suit: |
Appeal |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 0158 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 4, 2015 |
Filing
54
ORDER granting 52 Request to Lift Stay and for Dismissal of Appeal - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED as follows: 1) The stay entered by this Court's order on June 2, 2015 is LIFTED for the purpose of dismissing the above-caption ed appeal; 2) The above-captioned appeal, Case No. 5:14-cv-00541-F, is DISMISSED; and 3) Movants shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 9/4/2015. Copy of order sent via email to A. McNeill. (Grady, B.)
|
June 2, 2015 |
Filing
51
ORDER granting 48 Motion to Stay. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for deadline information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 6/2/2015. (Grady, B.)
|
March 30, 2015 |
Filing
47
ORDER granting 45 Motion to Stay. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/30/2015. (Edwards, S.)
|
November 13, 2014 |
Filing
41
ORDER granting 39 Motion to Stay. Counsel is reminded to read the order for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 11/13/2014. (Edwards, S.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: LSCG Fund 18, LLC v. Shotwell Landfill, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellant: LSCG Fund 18, LLC |
Represented By: |
Jennifer B. Lyday |
Represented By: |
Thomas W. Waldrep, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Shotwell Landfill, Inc. |
Represented By: |
William P. Janvier |
Represented By: |
Samantha Y. Moore |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Capitol Waste Transfer, LLC |
Represented By: |
William P. Janvier |
Represented By: |
Samantha Y. Moore |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Capitol Recycling, LLC |
Represented By: |
William P. Janvier |
Represented By: |
Samantha Y. Moore |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Debris Removal Partners, LLC |
Represented By: |
William P. Janvier |
Represented By: |
Samantha Y. Moore |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: Shotwell Transfer Station II, Inc. |
Represented By: |
William P. Janvier |
Represented By: |
Samantha Y. Moore |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Appellee: King's Grading, Inc. |
Represented By: |
William P. Janvier |
Represented By: |
Samantha Y. Moore |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?