Southwood v. The Credit Card Solution et al

Plaintiff: Sharon Southwood
Defendant: The Credit Card Solution, CCDN, LLC, R.K. Lock & Associates, Robert K Lock, Jr., Colleen Lock, Philip M. Manger and Robert M. Lindsey
Case Number: 7:2009cv00081
Filed: May 14, 2009
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Appoint Receiver; denying 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 30 Motion to Appoint Receiver; denying 32 Motion to Appoint Receiver; granting 39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen A. Dunn terminated; denying 41 Motion to Appoint Receiver; granting 43 Motion to Dismiss; granting 45 Motion to Expedite; granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss. Remaining individual defendants must cause new counsel to file wit hin (30) days of this order a notice of appearance or advise the court of their intention to proceed pro se. Defendants CCDN LLC and R.K. Lock & Associates must cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance within (30) days of this order. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 10/23/2012. Copies served via US Mail to the individuals as listed in the order. (Edwards, S.)
September 30, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant Manger has 30 days to file his Answer and his response to the Motion to CertifyClass. Additionally, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter default as to Defendants Robert K. Lock, Colleen Lock, R.K. Lock & Associates, and CCDN, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 9/30/2013. (Edwards, S.)
March 27, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion to Certify Class without prejudice to renew in 60 days. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to file an entry of default as to Defendant Philip Manger. The Court in its discretion consolidates cases 7:09-cv-81-F and 7:09-cv-183-F. Each filing shall continue to reflect case numbers 7:09-cv-81-F and 7:09-cv-183-F, but shall be filed only in the consolidated action. The Motion to Certify Class [DE-96] filed in 7:09-cv-183-F is DENIED without prejudice to renew in 60 days. The parties are reminded to read the order in its entirety for detailed information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/27/2014. (Grady, B.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwood v. The Credit Card Solution et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Southwood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Credit Card Solution
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCDN, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.K. Lock & Associates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K Lock, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Lock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip M. Manger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Lindsey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]