UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Sampson Personal Property, et al

Defendant: A 2008 Queen Cobra, A 2007 KTM 65SX, Sampson Personal Property,, A 2007 Haulmark Trailer, A 2008 Polaris Recreational Vehicle, A 2008 Polaris Razor Recreational Vehicle, A 2007 Kawasaki Motorcycle, A 2007 Bourget Motorcycle, A 2004 Kawasaki Motorcycle, A 2009 Kawasaki KX250-W Motorcycle, A 2006 Kawasaki KX450D-F Motorcycle, A 2007 Yamaha YZ85W1 Motorcycle, A 2010 Chevrolet Camaro Automobile, A 2005 Kawasaki KLX110-A4 Motorcycle, A 2007 Chevrolet Express Van, A 2005 Yamaha YFZ450T ATV, A 2006 Bombardier Outlander Max ATV (Trailer), a 2006 Seadee GTI 4TEC Watercraft, A 2008 Kawasaki Ninja Motorcycle, A 2008 Chevrolet Silverado, And any and all attachments thereto, And any and all proceeds from the sale of said property, A 2005 Chevrolet G3500 Express Van, A 2007 Cadillac Escalade and A 2008 Haulmark Trailer
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
 
Case Number: 7:2011cv00075
Filed: April 11, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: ROBESON
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Seal Document. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further instructions. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 5/5/2011. (Edwards, S.)
July 15, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 7/14/2011. (Edwards, S.)
August 10, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Default Judgment. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 8/10/2011. (Edwards, S.)
November 2, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Set Aside Default; granting 23 Motion to Set Aside Default. The Entry of Default 20 and Default Judgment 21 are SET ASIDE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to cause the claimants' separate proposed Answers appe nded to their motions to be filed and docketed, and to continue administration of this case according to the proceedings of this district. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for further information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 11/2/2011. (Edwards, S.)
August 1, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 8/1/2012. Copy to claimants via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
August 2, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against A 2004 Kawasaki Motorcycle, A 2005 Chevrolet G3500 Express Van, A 2005 Kawasaki KLX110-A4 Motorcycle, A 2005 Yamaha YFZ450T ATV, A 2006 Bombardier Outlander Max ATV (Trailer), A 2006 Kawa saki KX450D-F Motorcycle, A 2007 Bourget Motorcycle, A 2007 Cadillac Escalade, A 2007 Chevrolet Express Van, A 2007 Haulmark Trailer, A 2007 KTM 65SX, A 2007 Kawasaki Motorcycle, A 2007 Yamaha YZ85W1 Motorcycle, A 2008 Chevrolet Silverado, A 2008 Hau lmark Trailer, A 2008 Kawasaki Ninja Motorcycle, A 2008 Polaris Razor Recreational Vehicle, A 2008 Polaris Recreational Vehicle, A 2008 Queen Cobra, A 2009 Kawasaki KX250-W Motorcycle, A 2010 Chevrolet Camaro Automobile, And any and all attachments thereto, And any and all proceeds from the sale of said property, Sampson Personal Property and a 2006 Seadee GTI 4TEC Watercraft. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 8/2/2012. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Sampson Personal Property, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2008 Queen Cobra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2007 KTM 65SX
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sampson Personal Property,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2007 Haulmark Trailer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2008 Polaris Recreational Vehicle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2008 Polaris Razor Recreational Vehicle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2007 Kawasaki Motorcycle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2007 Bourget Motorcycle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2004 Kawasaki Motorcycle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2009 Kawasaki KX250-W Motorcycle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2006 Kawasaki KX450D-F Motorcycle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2007 Yamaha YZ85W1 Motorcycle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2010 Chevrolet Camaro Automobile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2005 Kawasaki KLX110-A4 Motorcycle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2007 Chevrolet Express Van
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2005 Yamaha YFZ450T ATV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2006 Bombardier Outlander Max ATV (Trailer)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: a 2006 Seadee GTI 4TEC Watercraft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2008 Kawasaki Ninja Motorcycle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2008 Chevrolet Silverado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: And any and all attachments thereto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: And any and all proceeds from the sale of said property
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2005 Chevrolet G3500 Express Van
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2007 Cadillac Escalade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2008 Haulmark Trailer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Stephen A. West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]