UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Jerabek Personal Property

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Jerabek Personal Property
Case Number: 7:2012cv00250
Filed: August 28, 2012
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: NEWHANOVER
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion for Entry of Default - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 03/19/2013. (Baker, C.)
March 27, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion for Default Judgment and Setting Case Schedule - The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/27/2013. (Baker, C.)
March 10, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Suppress; denying as moot 28 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief or Withdrawal of Claim; denying 16 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Return of Property; granting 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; and adopting 30 Memorandum and Recommendation - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/07/2014. (Baker, C.)
March 10, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 03/10/2014. (Baker, C.)
April 7, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 04/07/2014. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Jerabek Personal Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Stephen A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerabek Personal Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.