Gottlieb v. Gesmer et al

Defendant: Ellen Gesmer, Jo Ann Douglas and James Faison, III
Plaintiff: Ian Samuel Gottlieb
Case Number: 7:2013cv00049
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: PENDER
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion for Reconsideration regarding 7 Order. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 3/27/2013. Copy mailed to plaintiff via US Mail at address on record. (Marsh, K)
May 22, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 5/22/2013. Copy of order mailed to plaintiff via US Mail at address on record. (Marsh, K)
March 25, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 3/25/2013. Copy mailed to plaintiff via US Mail at address on record. (Marsh, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gottlieb v. Gesmer et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Gesmer
Represented By: Andrew H. Meier
Represented By: Michael J. Siudzinski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Ann Douglas
Represented By: James K. Dorsett, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Faison, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Samuel Gottlieb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]