Pak v Unifund CCR Partners et al

Defendant: Donna Primrose Brown, Esq., ZB Limited Partnership, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Unifund CCR Partners, Sessoms & Rogers, P.A., Credit Card Receivables Fund, Inc. and Amber K. Kauffman, Esq.
Plaintiff: Minna Pak
 
Case Number: 7:2013cv00070
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: BLADEN
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Stay Discovery: All discovery in this matter is STAYED pending the court's ruling on 11 Motion to Dismiss and 15 Motion to Sever. Following the court's disposition of the motions, the parties shall confer regarding a Rule 26(f) discovery plan within 21 days, and shall file a discovery plan within 15 days after the conference. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 6/17/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
January 9, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and denying as moot 15 Motion to Sever. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 1/9/2014. (Marsh, K)
January 22, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 1/22/2014. (Marsh, K)
January 22, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED defendants' motion to dismiss (DE # 11) is GRANTED. Judgment is entered in favor of defendants and this case is closed. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 1/22/2014. (Marsh, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pak v Unifund CCR Partners et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Primrose Brown, Esq.
Represented By: Dauna L. Bartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZB Limited Partnership
Represented By: Dauna L. Bartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Dauna L. Bartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifund CCR Partners
Represented By: Dauna L. Bartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sessoms & Rogers, P.A.
Represented By: Dauna L. Bartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Card Receivables Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Dauna L. Bartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber K. Kauffman, Esq.
Represented By: Dauna L. Bartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minna Pak
Represented By: Christopher W. Livingston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]