Hanson et al v. Lynch

Appellee: Marjorie K. Lynch
Appellant: Mary Darlene Hanson and George Robert Hanson
Case Number: 7:2013cv00103
Filed: May 14, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: NEWHANOVER
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/31/2013. A copy of the order was mailed to the pro se appellant. (Sawyer, D.)
September 27, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion for Rehearing. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 9/27/2013. A copy of the order was mailed to the pro se plaintiff. (Sawyer, D.)
November 27, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Appeal [D.E. 1] is DISMISSED. The decision of the Bankruptcy Court is AFFIRMED. The Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Debby Sawyer, Deputy Clerk for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 11/27/2013. A copy of the judgment was mailed to the pro se appellants. (Sawyer, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson et al v. Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Marjorie K. Lynch
Represented By: Brian Charles Behr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mary Darlene Hanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: George Robert Hanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]