La Casa Homes of NC, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bobby G Slate, SLATE MARKETING, INC., Slate Retail Systems, Inc., La Casa Homes of NC, Inc., La Casa Real Estate Development, LLC, La Casa Real Estate & Investment of SC, LLC, La Casa Real Estate and Investment, LLC, The Commons at Archdale, Inc., Palmetto Shores of Columbia, Inc., LA CASA HOMES, INC. and Blythewood Residential Development, Inc.
Defendant: RHONDA L. BYRD, JOSEPH BYRD, CHARLES D. WASHINGTON, Quincy Washington, John S. Washington, B23 Holdings, LLC, Ascott Kelly Group of NC, Inc., Ascott Kelly Hospitality Group, Inc., AK Holdings I, LLC, AK HOLDINGS II, LLC, AK HOLDINGS SC I, LLC, Windsor Holdings I, LLC, Ellison & Howell Properties, Inc., Quintoneli Development, Inc., Byrd Services, Inc. and Southern Community Bank and Trust
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00852
Filed: November 4, 2009
 
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Forsyth
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: WALLACE W. DIXON
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Racketeering (RICO)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2013 143 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 3/15/2013 RECOMMENDING; that Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and for Sanctions (Docket Entry 94 ) be granted in part and denied i n part in that, treating said Motion as objections under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(c)(2), the Court should decline to consider the affidavits of Rhonda Byrd (Docket Entry 77 ) and Charles Washington (Docket Entry 88 ) in deciding the instant summary judgm ent motions, but should not strike SCB's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Entry 72 ). FURTHER that Defendant John Washington [sic] Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Entry 70 ) be granted in part and denied in part in that the Cour t should enter judgment as a matter of law against Plaintiffs on the fraud and RICO claim(s) asserted against John, but the Court should refrain from taking action on any other asserted bases of liability not specifically addressed by John in briefin g. FURTHER that Defendant Quincy Washington's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Entry 74 ) be granted in part and denied in part in that the Court should enter judgment as a matter of law against Plaintiffs on their breach of fiduciar y duty and fraud claims against Quincy and RICO claim(s) against all Defendants, as well as all claims by Plaintiffs other than La Casa and Slate against Quincy, and should limit negligence damages based on N.C. Gen. Stat. § 25-4-406(f), but the Court should allow La Casa and Slate to maintain claims for conversion (on a civil conspiracy theory), negligence and fraudulent concealment against Quincy. FURTHER that Southern Community Bank and Trust's Motion for Summary Judgment (D ocket Entry 72 ) be granted in part and denied in part in that the Court should: (1) enter judgment as a matter of law against Plaintiffs on their claims for RICO, fraud and breach of fiduciary duty by SCB, as well as all claims by Plaintiffs other than La Casa against SCB; (2) enter judgment as a matter of law against Plaintiffs as to any request for damages occurring from unauthorized payments made more than one year before SCB made available to La Casa statements indicating unauthorized acco unt activity based on the application of N.C. Gen. Stat. § 25-4-406 (except as to damages arising from any respondeat superior liability in connection with Plaintiffs' claims against Quincy for fraudulent concealment and/or conspiracy to co mmit conversion), for punitive damages against SCB, for damages occurring before SCB began doing business with La Casa; and for lost profit damages as to all Defendants; and (3) allow La Casa to maintain claims against SCB for fraudulent concealment and conspiracy to commit conversion on a respondeat superior theory as well as for negligence on a respondeat superior theory and as to the handling the La Casa account. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Entry [ 81]) be granted in part and denied in part in that the Court should: (1) decline to enter summary judgment in favor of Plaintiffs for their fraudulent transfer (or previously addressed RICO) claims against Rhonda, Charles and the corporate Defendant entities; (2) enter judgment as a matter of law as to liability against Charles on Plaintiffs' claims for conversion, fraud, and fraudulent concealment in addition to liability as a coconspirator on those same claims against Rhonda (except to th e extent they relate to the Jewelry Conversion and the Payroll Conversion); (3) decline to enter judgment as a matter of law against Rhonda on Plaintiffs' claims of conversion, fraud, fraudulent concealment and breach of fiduciary duty so that t hose claims may proceed to trial for resolution of statute of limitations issues; and (4) enter judgment as a matter of law in favor of Plaintiffs on Rhonda and Charles's counterclaim for intentional infliction of emotional distress. (Sheets, Jamie)
May 16, 2013 161 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER, AND RECOMMENTATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 5/16/2013, ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Motion to Show Cause and for Contempt (Docket Entry 118 ) is GRANTED and R honda Byrd, Charles Washington and QuintonEli Development, Inc. shall show cause why the Court should not hold them in civil contempt for violating the Orders granting a preliminary injunction and appointing a receiver in this matter. The Court will enter a further Order or Notice regarding the time, place, and manner by which such cause shall be shown. RECOMMENDING that Defendants Rhonda Byrd, Joseph Byrd, John S. Washington, Charles Washington's and all related Company's Motion for Relief from Orders for Receivership & Injunction (Docket Entry 122 ) be DENIED. (Lloyd, Donna)
June 10, 2013 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 06/10/2013, adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation as set out herein. (Israel, Lisa)
November 2, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER, RECOMMENDATION signed by MAG/JUDGE WALLACE W. DIXON on 11/2/10, recommending that the court DENY Plaintiffs' motion to remand the case to state court (docket no. 22 ). Furthermore, the motion for oral argument by Plaintiffs is DENIED (docket no. 27 ). (Law, Trina)
November 9, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/9/11, Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Expedited Oral Argument (Docket Entry 40 ) be DENIED. (Law, Trina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: La Casa Homes of NC, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby G Slate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SLATE MARKETING, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slate Retail Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Casa Homes of NC, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Casa Real Estate Development, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Casa Real Estate & Investment of SC, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Casa Real Estate and Investment, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Commons at Archdale, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palmetto Shores of Columbia, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA CASA HOMES, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blythewood Residential Development, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHONDA L. BYRD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH BYRD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES D. WASHINGTON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B23 Holdings, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascott Kelly Group of NC, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascott Kelly Hospitality Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AK Holdings I, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AK HOLDINGS II, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AK HOLDINGS SC I, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Holdings I, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellison & Howell Properties, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quintoneli Development, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byrd Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Community Bank and Trust
Represented By: ELLIOT A. FUS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]