SMITH v. U.S. GOVERNMENT et al

Plaintiff: KEVIN M. SMITH
Defendant: U.S. GOVERNMENT, U.S. TREASUREY DEPARTMENT, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE and NOREEN BAVARO
Case Number: 1:2010cv00673
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Cabarrus
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6212
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. on 2/19/2013 Adopting the Magistrate Judge's order of September 13, 2010 (Doc. [4)]; The court dispenses with oral argument and hereby AFFIRMS AND ADOPTS the order of the Magistrate Judge dated S eptember 13, 2010. Plaintiff is further cautioned that, as found by the Magistrate Judge, Plaintiff will not be permitted to appear on behalf of a corporation in this case unless Plaintiff is a duly licensed attorney authorized to appear in this cour t. Plaintiff is hereby cautioned that his continued appearance in a pro se capacity on behalf of a corporation (see Doc. 6 (requesting extension and other relief on behalf of "Plaintiffs"), Doc. 13 at 2 ("Plaintiffs enter Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss") and Doc. 15 at 1 ("Herein now Comes the Plaintiffs")) may result in sanctions, including dismissal. (Sheets, Jamie)
February 28, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. on 2/28/2013 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation 8 ; that, to the extent "Plaintiffs [sic] Response to Magistrate [sic] Decision with Motions by Plaintiffs" (Doc. [6)] sets forth a dispositive motion seeking judgment against Defendants, said motion is DENIED. (Sheets, Jamie)
July 5, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/5/2013; that the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants (Docket Entry 10 ) be GRANTED and that this action be dismissed. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 13, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Affidavit/Declaration in Support (Docket Entry 1) is DENIED. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 9/13/2010. (Lapira, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. U.S. GOVERNMENT et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN M. SMITH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. GOVERNMENT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. TREASUREY DEPARTMENT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOREEN BAVARO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]