FISHER v. THE WINSTON SALEM POLICE DEPT. et al

Plaintiff: WILLIAM RAY FISHER
Defendant: THE WINSTON SALEM POLICE DEPT., TONY PERKINS, SCOTT CUNNINGHAM and CLIFF CRANFORD
Case Number: 1:2012cv00868
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Forsyth
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
Referring Judge: L. PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 03/28/2014 as set out herein. RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Docket Entry 23 ) be DENIED and that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docket Entries 8 and 14 ) be GRANTED.(Taylor, Abby)
June 27, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 06/27/2014, as set out herein. ORDERED that Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 8 is GRANTED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(1) and 12(b)(6). As such, Plaintiff's lawsuit against Sergeant Tony Perkins, Scott Cunningham, and Cliff Cranford, is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER that Official Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 14 i s GRANTED IN PART, and that Plaintiff's action against the Winston- Salem Police Department is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to amend his Complaint to cure the deficiencies discussed herein. If Plaintiff chooses to amend his Complaint, he must do so, consistent with the ruling of this Court, within 14 days of entry of this Order, or this action will be dismissed with prejudice.(Taylor, Abby)
February 4, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER igned by JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR. on 02/04/2015. For the reasons stated herein, the Court finds that Plaintiff has sufficiently pled an age discrimination claim. However, the Court further finds that Plaintiff h as abandoned his retaliation claim, and Plaintiff has insufficiently pled an intentional infliction of emotional distress claim. Accordingly, the Court will grant in part and deny in part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 37 ]. Specificall y, the Court will deny Defendant's Motion as to Plaintiff's age discrimination claim and grant Defendant's Motion as to Plaintiff's intentional infliction emotional distress claim. Finally, the Court deems Plaintiff's retaliation claim as having been abandoned by Plaintiff's failure to assert this claim in his Amended Complaint. ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 37 ] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART.(Taylor, Abby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FISHER v. THE WINSTON SALEM POLICE DEPT. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM RAY FISHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WINSTON SALEM POLICE DEPT.
Represented By: ANTHONY J. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY PERKINS
Represented By: JAMES R. MORGAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: JAMES R. MORGAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLIFF CRANFORD
Represented By: JAMES R. MORGAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]