MARKET STREET PRESS, INC. v. GOOGLE, INC. Featured Case

Plaintiff: MARKET STREET PRESS, INC.
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01016
Filed: September 12, 2012
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Moore
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C. EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2013 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by MARKET STREET PRESS, INC.. (SAR, DAVID)
April 2, 2013 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 4/7/2014 at 9:30 AM in Unassigned Courtroom before UNASSIGNED JUDGE. Trial Briefs, etc., due 3/17/2014.(Sanders, Marlene)
February 28, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER Appointing JONATHAN R. HARKAVY as the mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl)
February 25, 2013 MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER added as referral judge. MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE no longer assigned to case. (Powell, Gloria)
January 22, 2013 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Selection of Mediator due by 2/20/2013. Mediation due by 7/8/2013. (Gammon, Cheryl)
January 22, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 01/22/2013; approving 13 RULE JOINT 26F REPORT as submitted and as noted herein. Discovery shall be established as Complex. Mediation should be conducted during the discovery period, the exact date to be set by the mediator after consultation with the parties. The parties will report to the Court their selection of a mediator by February 20, 2013. The parties do not consent to reference of the case to a Magistrate Judge. Trial of the action is expected to take approximately 5 days. A jury trial has been demanded. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 2/24/2013. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 2/24/2013. Discovery due by 11/8/2013. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 2/24/2013. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 2/24/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 12/8/2013. (Garland, Leah)
January 10, 2013 Motions Referred: RE: 13 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
January 9, 2013 13 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by MARKET STREET PRESS, INC. (CAGE, REBECCA)
November 26, 2012 12 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 1/24/2013 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
November 13, 2012 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by GOOGLE, INC. (PARSONS, GARY)
October 9, 2012 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant GOOGLE, INC., filed by MARKET STREET PRESS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Company Info. Folder), # 2 Exhibit B-1 (Catalog Excerpts), # 3 Exhibit B-2 (Catalog Excerpts), # 4 Exhibit C (Trade Show Display), # 5 Exhibit D (Trade Show Display), # 6 Exhibit E (Trade Show Display), # 7 Exhibit F (Customer Invoice), # 8 Exhibit G (Business Card), # 9 Exhibit H (Envelope), # 10 Exhibit I (Market Street Webpage), # 11 Exhibit J (Market Street Bag), # 12 Exhibit K (Trade Show Participant Listing), # 13 Exhibit L (Google Blog Announcement), # 14 Exhibit M (Google I/O Conference Announcement), # 15 Exhibit N (Google Commercial Video Screenshot), # 16 Exhibit O (Google Commercial Video Screenshot), # 17 Exhibit P (Google Product Advertising), # 18 Exhibit Q (Google Product Advertising - Canada), # 19 Exhibit R (Google Product Advertising - Australia), # 20 Exhibit S (Google Product Advertising - Germany), # 21 Exhibit T (Google Homepage Advertisement))(CAGE, REBECCA)
October 9, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for GOOGLE, INC. Answer due by 11/13/2012. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/09/12. (Brubaker, John)
October 8, 2012 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JENNIFER MOUCHET HALL on behalf of Defendant GOOGLE, INC. (HALL, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2012 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOOGLE, INC. (PARSONS, GARY)
October 8, 2012 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by GOOGLE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (PARSONS, GARY)
September 18, 2012 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID WILLIAM SAR on behalf of Plaintiff MARKET STREET PRESS, INC. (SAR, DAVID)
September 12, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah)
September 12, 2012 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Garland, Leah)
September 12, 2012 3 Summons Issued as to GOOGLE, INC. (Garland, Leah)
September 12, 2012 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARKET STREET PRESS, INC. (CAGE, REBECCA)
September 12, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against GOOGLE, INC. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0418- 1177359), filed by MARKET STREET PRESS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Company Info. Folder), # 2 Exhibit B-1 (Catalog Excerpts), # 3 Exhibit B-2 (Catalog Excerpts), # 4 Exhibit C (Trade Show Display), # 5 Exhibit D (Trade Show Display), # 6 Exhibit E (Trade Show Display), # 7 Exhibit F (Customer Invoice), # 8 Exhibit G (Business Card), # 9 Exhibit H (Envelope), # 10 Exhibit I (Market Street Webpage), # 11 Exhibit J (Market Street Bag), # 12 Exhibit K (Trade Show Participant Listing), # 13 Exhibit L (Google Blog Announcement), # 14 Exhibit M (Google I/O Conference Announcement), # 15 Exhibit N (Google Video Advertising Screenshot), # 16 Exhibit O (Google Product Advertising), # 17 Exhibit P (Google Homepage Advertisement) (CAGE, REBECCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARKET STREET PRESS, INC. v. GOOGLE, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARKET STREET PRESS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID WILLIAM SAR
Represented By: REBECCA L. CAGE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER MOUCHET HALL
Represented By: GARY S. PARSONS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]