LONG v. LIBERTYWOOD NURSING CENTER et al

Plaintiff: BRIDGET M. LONG
Defendant: LIBERTYWOOD NURSING CENTER, WILLIAM SCHUTZ and DEBBIE DRAUGHN
Case Number: 1:2013cv00315
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: L. PATRICK AULD
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L. OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. on 1/28/2014, that Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 13 , as more specifically stated in Doc. 14 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is DENIE D as to Plaintiff's claim of retaliation in violation of Title VII as described in the Complaint and related attachment. The motion is GRANTED as to any other claim for relief. FURTHER, that Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to Defendants William Schutz and Debbie Draughn, and those Defendants are DISMISSED from this action. (Daniel, J)
July 23, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 7/23/2014, that Defendants Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures (Docket Entry 31 ) is GRANTED, except as to Defendant's requests for sanctions, expense-shifting, and mo dification of the Scheduling Order. FURTHER that Plaintiff must serve upon Defendant, on or before August 1, 2014, a list of names of individuals likely to have discoverable information, including such individuals' addresses, telephone numbers, and the subjects of that information. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action.(Daniel, J)
February 24, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. on 2/24/2015, that Plaintiff's Pro Se Motion/Request that the Court Subpoena Witnesses for Trial (Doc. 28 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. FURTHER that Plaintiff's Pro S e Motion/ Request that Mediation Fees be Waived (Doc. 29 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff will not be required to pay mediation costs. FURTHER that Plaintiff's Motion Request to file Report in Court Records of Mediation Session Results and Reli ef from Assessed Payment of $500 (Doc. 48 ) is DENIED. FURTHER that Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Affidavit (Doc. 53 ) is DENIED. FURTHER that Defendant's Motion to Strike Two of Plaintiff's Exhibi ts (Doc. 56 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant's Motion to Strike page 28 of Plaintiff's Brief (Doc. 52 ) is GRANTED, but Defendant's Motion to Strike page 23-24 of Plaintiff's Brief is DENIED. FURTHER that Plaintiff's Pre-trial Motion For United States Constitutional Law Clarity Concerns And Civil Rights Court Proceedings (Doc. 61 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. FINALLY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 44 ) is GRANTED and that this action is DISMISSED. A judgment consistent with this Memorandum Opinion and Order and the Memorandum Opinion and Order filed January 28, 2014, will be entered contemporaneously herewith. (Daniel, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LONG v. LIBERTYWOOD NURSING CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIDGET M. LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTYWOOD NURSING CENTER
Represented By: JAMES RUPERT NANCE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM SCHUTZ
Represented By: JAMES RUPERT NANCE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBBIE DRAUGHN
Represented By: JAMES RUPERT NANCE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]