State of North Carolina v. Tennessee Valley Authority

Case Number: 1:2006cv00020
Filed: January 30, 2006
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
Presiding Judge: Lacy Thornburg
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7413(b) Clean Air Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2009 182 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT Denying in part and Granting in part North Carolina's request for Injunctive Relief. Signed by District Judge Lacy Thornburg on 01/13/2009. (thh)
February 18, 2009 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Counsel to Appear and Present Oral Argument re 183 MOTION to Alter Judgment and Clarify this Courts Judgment on Friday, March 20, 2009 at 11:00 AM Main Courtroom.. Signed by District Judge Lacy Thornburg on 02/18/2009. (thh)
August 14, 2009 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 195 Motion to Stay this Courts Judgment pending appeal. Signed by District Judge Lacy Thornburg on August 14, 2009. (jhg)
October 1, 2010 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING WTTH PREJUDICE in accordance with the instructions of the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/01/10. (emw)
October 5, 2010 234 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 10/01/10. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 10/05/10. (emw)
December 23, 2010 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 233 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by District Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 12/23/10. (emw) Modified on 12/23/2010 to correct text (emw).
February 6, 2006 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael D. Goodstein for State of North Carolina . Signed by Judge Dennis Howell on 2/6/06. (Gosnell, Joan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of North Carolina v. Tennessee Valley Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]