Southern Alliance for Clean Energy et al v. Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC

Plaintiff: Southern Alliance for Clean Energy, Environmental Defense Fund, National Parks Conservation Association, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club
Defendant: Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC
Case Number: 1:2008cv00318
Filed: July 16, 2008
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: RutherFord
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Lacy Thornburg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Lacy Thornburg on August 26, 2009. (jhg) Modified on 8/27/2009 (jhg).
October 8, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to supplement the record. Signed by District Judge Lacy Thornburg on October 8, 2008. (jhg)
December 2, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 24 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 26 Motion to Dismiss; granting 39 Motion to supplement the record. Signed by District Judge Lacy Thornburg on December 2, 2008. (jhg) Modified on 12/2/2008 (jhg).
December 2, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Environmental Defense Fund, National Parks Conservation Association, Natural Resources Defense Council, Southern Alliance for Clean Energy against Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC. Signed by District Judge Lacy Thornburg on December 2, 2008. (jhg)
January 9, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending an invitation to the Office of the N.C. Attorney General to file an amicus brief by January 20, 2009. Signed by District Judge Lacy Thornburg on January 9, 2009. (jhg)
July 2, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 73 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 75 Motion to Enforce Judgment; granting 80 Motion for Leave to File surreply to Defendants motion for summary judgment and the s urreply attached to the motion is hereby deemed filed and a part ofthe proceedings hereinand granting 83 Motion for Leave to file supplemental authorityand the attachment to such motion is deemed filed and a part of the proceedings herein. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that, for the reasons stated herein, the Court in its discretion, abstains from further involvement in this case, and this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Lacy Thornburg on July 2, 2009. (jhg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Alliance for Clean Energy et al v. Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Alliance for Clean Energy
Represented By: John Timothy Suttles, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By: John Timothy Suttles, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: John Timothy Suttles, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: John Timothy Suttles, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: John Timothy Suttles, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]