Jemiki Properties, LLP v. Premier Realty Management, LLC

Plaintiff: Jemiki Properties, LLP
Defendant: Premier Realty Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00228
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Madison
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Lacy Thornburg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance plaintiff's Notice of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on April 1, 2010. (jhg) (Main Document 15 replaced on 4/1/2010) (jhg). NEF REGENERATED
June 9, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING without prejudice re 16 MOTION/Request to Clerk to Issue Notice to Claim Exempt Property. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/4/2010. (jhg)
October 7, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the respective parties file the CIAC and a proposed Pretrial Order not later than the close of business on Friday, October 9, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on October 6, 2009. (jhg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jemiki Properties, LLP v. Premier Realty Management, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jemiki Properties, LLP
Represented By: Jenna L Blackwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Realty Management, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]