Skeels et al v. Bank of America, NA

Plaintiff: Althea L. A. Skeels and CHFS Partners
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00335
Filed: August 25, 2009
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Lacy Thornburg
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting motion 13 Set/Reset Deadline and plaintiffs are allowed to Serve a response to defendant's 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (Responses due by 12/8/2009.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/1/09. (jhg) Modified on 12/2/2009 (jhg). Added motion number. NEF REGENERATED.
December 15, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Bank of America, NA Objections to M&R due by 1/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on December 15, 2009. (jhg)
January 7, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Memorandum and Recommendations re 16 Memorandum and Recommendations.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on January 7, 2010. (jhg)
January 7, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of defendant against plaintiff. Signed by direction of Senior Judge Graham Mullen on January 7, 2010. (jhg)
August 27, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Erik David Wesoloski for Althea L. A. Skeels and CHFS Partners. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on August 26, 2009. (jhg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Skeels et al v. Bank of America, NA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Althea L. A. Skeels
Represented By: R. Wade Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHFS Partners
Represented By: R. Wade Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]