Synovus Bank v. Karp et al

Defendant: James G. Karp, G. Daniel Siegel and Karp Family Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00172
Filed: August 19, 2010
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting (74) Motion to Compel in case 1:10-cv-00172-MR-DLH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/29/2013. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00172-MR-DLH et al.(thh)
August 12, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 96 Order on Motion to Compel; overruling 100 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Decision (Rule 72(a)) re 96 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/12/13. (nll)
August 14, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that because the parties have resolved the award of attorneys' fees on their own, no further Order from the Court is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/14/13. (nll)
November 3, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/3/10. (siw)
January 21, 2014 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Plaintiff Synovus Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment. This action is hereby STAYED with respect to Defendants Benjamin Atkinson and Katherine Williams pending a determination of the respective Trustees in Bankruptcy as to whether to pursue this litigation. Counsel for the Defendants is directed to provide a copy of this Order to the respective Trustees. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/17/2014. (thh)
January 21, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Synovus Bank against Anthony J. Barbieri, Barron S. Wall, Kevin J. Tracy, Patricia M. Tracy. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/17/2014. (thh)
February 24, 2014 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (147 in 1:10-cv-00172-MR-DLH) Stipulation as to Award of Attorney's Fees. The Judgment 144 is hereby AMENDED to include an award of attorneys' fees to the Plaintiff Synovus Bank with respect to Defendants. See Order for Details. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00172-MR-DLH et al.(thh)
February 25, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT-ORDERED that Plaintiff Synovus Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment 83 is GRANTED, and the Plaintiff is entitled to judgment against the following Borrowers. (See Order for Details) Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/24/2014. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00172-MR-DLH et al.(thh)
December 10, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Consolidating Cases for Discovery. All further pleadings to be docketed to: 1:10cv172. Member Case: 1:10cv201; 1:10cv202; 1:10cv215; 1:10cv217; 1:10cv218; 1:10cv220; 1:10cv221; 1:10cv231 to be administratively closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/10/10. (siw)
August 15, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss; accepting 36 Memorandum and Recommendations. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall conduct an initial attorneys' co nference within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order and shall file a Certificate of Initial Attorneys' Conference within seven (7) days thereafter. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/15/12. (nll) Modified on 8/15/2012 (nll).
February 6, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Thomas William McGee, III for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/6/13. (nll)
February 6, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Tara Cloer Sullivan for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/6/13. (nll)
September 9, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Brian C. Athey for James G. Karp,Brian C. Athey for James G. Karp,Brian C. Athey for Karp Family Limited Partnership,Brian C. Athey for Karp Family Limited Partnership,Brian C. Athey for G. Daniel Siegel,Brian C. Athey for G. Daniel Siegel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/9/10. (siw)
May 28, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Aaron Samuel Book for 3GMA Realty, LLC, Gerald Abatemarco, Benjamin W. Atkinson, Anthony J. Barbieri, Daniel S. Hinkson, James G. Karp, Karp Family Limited Partnership, Gregory S Keary, G. Daniel Siegel, Kevin J. Tracy, Patricia M. Tracy, Barron S. Wall, Katherine H. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/28/13. (emw)
June 20, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending section III of 59 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/20/13. (nll)
July 2, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 94 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/2/13. (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Karp et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Karp
Represented By: Edward Louis Bleynat, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Daniel Siegel
Represented By: Edward Louis Bleynat, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karp Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Edward Louis Bleynat, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: Scott K. Dillin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]