RES-NC Settlers Edge, LLC et al vs Settlers Edge Holding Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: RES-NC Settlers Edge, LLC
Defendant: Settlers Edge Holding Company, LLC, Mountain Air Development Corporation, Virginia M. Banks, William R. Banks, Jeani H. Banks, Michael R. Watson, Sheree B. Watson, Morris Atkins, in his capacity as TRUSTEE of William A. Banks Revocable Trust, as Amended and Restated, Morris Atkins, in his capacity as TRUSTEE of William Banks Family Irrevocable Trust Number 1 and Morris Atkins, in his capacity as TRUSTEE of William Banks Family Irrevocable Trust Number 2
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00173
Filed: August 19, 2010
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Alexander
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on or before 30 days from entry of this Order, Pltf. shall file response advising the Court of its intention to further prosecute this matter. ( Responses due by 11/17/2010). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/18/10. (nll)
January 5, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David Keesler for all further proceedings Motions referred: 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/5/11. (siw)Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 6, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the [Doc. 29] Memorandum and Recommendations is REJECTED, the Defendants Objection [Doc. 30] is SUSTAINED, and the Defendants [Doc.14] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is GRANTED, and this matter is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/3/11. (siw)
September 6, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 9/6/11. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (siw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: RES-NC Settlers Edge, LLC et al vs Settlers Edge Holding Company, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RES-NC Settlers Edge, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Eli Pearce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Settlers Edge Holding Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Air Development Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia M. Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeani H. Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Watson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheree B. Watson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Atkins, in his capacity as TRUSTEE of William A. Banks Revocable Trust, as Amended and Restated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Atkins, in his capacity as TRUSTEE of William Banks Family Irrevocable Trust Number 1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Atkins, in his capacity as TRUSTEE of William Banks Family Irrevocable Trust Number 2
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]