Synovus Bank v. Pisgah Property Solutions, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Pisgah Property Solutions, L.L.C. and Kenneth Porter-Shirley
Case Number: 1:2011cv00016
Filed: January 26, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Pisgah Property Solutions, L.L.C., Kenneth Porter-Shirley (nll)
July 3, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Vacate ; VACATING 7 Clerk's Entry of Default and 11 Default Judgment. Further Ordered Plaintiff to file amended complaint within 14 days of entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/3/12. (bsw)
January 7, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Show Cause Order 17 is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/04/2013. (thh)
January 14, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Synovus Bank against Pisgah Property Solutions, L.L.C., Kenneth Porter-Shirley. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 1/14/13. (nll) Modified text on 1/14/2013 (ejb).
March 14, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pltf. file an appropriate motion or take further action to move this case forward not later than 3/25/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/14/11. (ejb)
June 10, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pltf. file an appropriate motion or take further action with respect to this matter no later than 7/5/11. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/10/11. (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Pisgah Property Solutions, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pisgah Property Solutions, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Porter-Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.