Gust v. US Airways, Inc.

Defendant: US Airways and US Airways Payroll/Garnishments Services
Plaintiff: Thomas E Gust
Case Number: 1:2011cv00133
Filed: June 2, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cleveland
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/30/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(siw)
December 16, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Dismiss and this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice; and Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Recommendation are hereby REJECTED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/16/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nll)
December 27, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 12/16/11. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/27/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nll)
June 27, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ROSEBORO ORDER that Plaintiff file his written response to Defendants Motions to Dismiss [# 2] not later than July 8, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/27/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(siw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gust v. US Airways, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Airways
Represented By: Evan Margosian Sauda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Airways Payroll/Garnishments Services
Represented By: Evan Margosian Sauda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Gust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.