Sisk v. Abbott Laboratories

Plaintiff: Kimberly S. Sisk
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Case Number: 1:2011cv00159
Filed: June 29, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: XX, Outside State
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pip
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to appear for a hearing re: 101 MOTION to Compel DISCLOSURE OR DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT.( Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/26/2013. (thh)
March 25, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 101 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/22/13. (bsw)
July 25, 2013 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 129 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Mediation Deadline, ( Mediation deadline RESET for 12/15/2013.), Motions terminated: 129 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Mediation Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/25/13. (nll)
February 10, 2014 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting with respect to the Plaintiff's claim for negligent design based on the failure to treat the product with biocide. In all other respects, the [ 133] Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/10/2014. (thh)
February 10, 2014 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony 136 is Denied without Prejudice to challenges during trial to the jury's consideration of the experts' opinions. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/10/2014. (thh)
February 10, 2014 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 156 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/10/2014. (thh)
February 24, 2014 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 197 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Daniel E. Reidy for Abbott Laboratories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/21/2014. (thh)
February 24, 2014 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 164 Joint Motion Requesting the Use of a Jury Questionnaire Prior to Trial. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/24/2014. (thh)
February 24, 2014 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 167 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/24/2014. (thh)
March 18, 2014 234 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that this action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety, and the Defendant shall recover its costs of the action from the Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/18/2014. (thh)
May 9, 2014 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Pltf's 239 Motion to File Sealed Submissions and Documents; and denying without prejudice Deft's 241 Unopposed Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/9/14. (ejb)
October 20, 2014 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Pltf's 236 and 249 Motions for a New Trial. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/20/2014. (klb)
October 20, 2014 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 244 and 248 Motions to Seal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/20/2014. (klb)
July 1, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kate Westad for Kimberly S. Sisk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on July 1, 2011. (jhg)
July 1, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Stephen C. Rathke for Kimberly S. Sisk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/1/11. (ejb) NEF Regenerated to Stephen C. Rathke on 7/1/2011 (ejb).
July 6, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion for Leave for June K. Ghezzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on July 6, 2011. (jhg)
July 6, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Motion for Leave for Paula Quist to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on July 6, 2011. (jhg)
September 9, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Attys Melissa Hirst, Sara Daggett, and William Tipping ORDERED to either register for ECF account and move to be admitted pro hac vice by 9/16/11, or the Court will direct the Clerk to remove them as attys of record in this case and they will not be allowed to practice before the Court in this matter, re: 6/29/11 Notice & 8/1/11 Second Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/9/11. (ejb)
September 15, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion for Leave for Melissa B. Hirst to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/13/11. (ejb)
April 9, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion to Strike. The Court strikes the response to Supplemental Filing in Opposition to Abbott's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/9/2012. (pdf)
August 2, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as to Count One and granting as to Counts Two, Three, Four and Five 77 Deft's Motion to Dismiss Pltf's Second Amended Complaint; accepting 89 Memorandum and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/2/12. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sisk v. Abbott Laboratories
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly S. Sisk
Represented By: Stephen Carl Rathke
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Euler
Represented By: Kate Geralyn Westad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Sara H. Daggett
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: Melissa B. Hirst
Represented By: Paula Sue Quist
Represented By: William J. Tipping
Represented By: James Walker Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]