Synovus Bank v. Garvey

Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Randy J. Garvey
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00186
Filed: July 29, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2012 21 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant may file an amended Answer and Counterclaim within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order in order to assert an additional counterclaim under Chapter 75 against the Plaintiff Synovus Bank. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/15/12. (nll)
February 27, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added T. Ryan Langley for Randy J. Garvey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/27/13. (nll)
March 13, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER denying Motion for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Present Consolidated Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission by Synovus Bank (Doc. 77 filed in case no. 1:11cv66). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/12/13. (nll)
March 27, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added T. William McGee, III for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/27/13. (nll)
July 11, 2013 39 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/11/13. (ejb)
August 16, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER that this action is hereby STAYED until further Order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/16/13. (nll)
February 4, 2014 48 Featured Case ORDER that within 30 days of the entry of this Order, the Bankruptcy Trustee shall file a report regarding his determination regarding the prosecution of the counterclaims and third-party claims asserted by the Defendant in this action. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/04/2014. (thh)
March 6, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER stay of this action lifted with respect to Deft Randy J. Garvey's counterclaims and third-party claims only. Action remains stayed with respect to Pltf's claims against Deft Garvey. Within 14 days of entry of this Order, Deft Garvey shall advise the Court in writing whether he intends to pursue these counterclaims and third-party claims. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/6/14. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Garvey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy J. Garvey
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]