Synovus Bank v. Ballas

Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Thomas P. Ballas
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00188
Filed: July 29, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2012 21 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss; Deft may file an amended Answer and Counterclaim within 14 days of the entry of this Order. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/15/12. (ejb) Modified text on 8/15/2012 (ejb). NEF Regenerated.
March 13, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER denying Motion for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Present Consolidated Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission by Synovus Bank (Doc. 77 filed in case no. 1:11cv66). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/12/13. (nll)
March 27, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added T. William McGee, III for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/27/13. (ejb)
July 11, 2013 36 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 7/11/13. (ejb)
August 22, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER that the parties shall have 30 days from the entry of this Order in which to file a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/22/2013. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Ballas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. Ballas
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]